Woods v. Department of Public Safety et al
Plaintiff: Travon Levi Woods
Defendant: Department of Public Safety, Ronald Covington, A Hunt and FNU Barnes
Case Number: 3:2018cv00664
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) as to Travon Levi Woods (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Order)(tob)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Mail ( #3 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement) addressed to Travon Woods returned as undeliverable. (brl)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 Mail (Document #3 ) addressed to Travon Levi Woods returned as undeliverable. (brl)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 12/20/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ni)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Pro Se AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by Travon Levi Woods (rth)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against FNU Barnes, Ronald Covington, Department of Public Safety, A Hunt with Jury Demand, filed by Travon Levi Woods. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Department of Public Safety et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travon Levi Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?