Thaxton et al v. Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Angela Mayes and Barbara Thaxton
Defendant: Bojangles' Restaurants, Incorporated and Bojangles', Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00665
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 146 NOTICE of Consents to Join Kristi Linville-Burris, Dorothy Henderson, Dilon Wilson, Clint Hickson, Preston Hall, ShaMeea Grice, Janna Taylor, Taylor Blackwell, Perry Hutchins, Victoria Myers and Heather Cates by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
February 4, 2019 Filing 145 NOTICE of Consents to Join Frances Harris, Richard Kirkley, Heather Phillips, Taneisha Smith, Priscilla Pope, Tonya Glossin, Cody Fisher, Jamie Compton, Suntiana Cassidine, Mark McDonald, Holly Burress, Brenda Johnson, Katherine Davis, Chelsea Light, Spencer Young and Amelia Cassar by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
February 1, 2019 Filing 144 NOTICE of Consents to Join Ryan Robinson, Ashley Cook, Aimee Clear and Richard Kirkley by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
February 1, 2019 Filing 143 NOTICE of Consents to Join Terena Green, Ciera Bethea, Stephanie Davis, Kasandra Ervin, Ransome McLeod, Katrina McCullough, Crystal Tanner, Jessica Hailey, Sarah Mott, Heather Webster, Stacy McGee, Kelly Clark and Marsha Chambers. by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon) Modified text on 2/5/2019 (rth).
January 31, 2019 Filing 142 NOTICE of Consents to Join Sean Walker, Maureen Matton, Kyle King, Roger Cochran, Jr., Wilkesha Erby, and Jason Hall by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
January 31, 2019 Filing 141 NOTICE of Opt-in Plaintiff Withdrawal from Lawsuit by Danny Bowie by Barbara Thaxton (Jackson, Gordon)
January 30, 2019 Filing 140 NOTICE of Consents to Join Connie Gallahar, Anthony Roberts, Sharon Rawls and Brandi Harbin by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
January 29, 2019 Filing 139 NOTICE of Consent to Join Cleo Isler, Jr. by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
January 29, 2019 Filing 138 NOTICE of Consents to Join Amanda Burkeadorno Turner, Tishani Browne-Fortune, Orlando Jackson and Brian Edwards by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
January 28, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE of Consents to Join DaTavia McDowell, Andrea Callaway, Christy Meeks, Steven Banks, Kimberly Haynes, Raymond Robbins, Latoya Brown, Bonnie Price, Ebony Jordan, Kenneth Edwards, Rashard Elliot, William Hunter, III, Sheena Bartley, Christopher Warren, Jaquan Hardy, Christal Hylton, Chasity Beahm, Katherine Hutcherson, Sandra Midgette, Barry Sutherland and Taneisha Collins Sims by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
January 25, 2019 Filing 136 NOTICE of Consent to Join Kenneth Edwards by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
January 25, 2019 Filing 135 NOTICE of Consents to Join Lauren Ballard Smith and Cynthia Hornbeck by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
January 24, 2019 Filing 134 NOTICE of Consents to Join Darian Bouley and Brittany Bouley by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
January 23, 2019 Filing 133 NOTICE of Consents to Join Jessica Martinez, Charles Rabbeth, John Mann, Britteny Cisneros, Andre Rodrigues, Verikida Gibbs, Nancy Drolson, Tyler Clark, Joseph Jarvis, Heather Al Hinki, Tawanda Chambers, William Hensley, II, Kauren Butler and Shiree McCrory by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
January 22, 2019 Filing 132 NOTICE of Consents to Join Clarence Fell, Donica Baisten, Hope Johnson, Reubene Mateen-Buelleau, Calvin Jennings, Barry Holtamp, Kira Hall, Freddale Carson, Lee Schreiber McQuinn, Teresa Johnson, Sameerah Jones, Rikki Metts, Karen Lorinsky, Curtis Hren, John Mann, Arthenia Bagley, Sandra Liza, Trudy Lambeth, Chantille Kendall, Lacey Blackwell, Lisa R. Center and Santiago Rodriguez, Jr., by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
January 16, 2019 Filing 131 NOTICE of Consents to Join Michael Frizzell, Kevin Claven, Quantina Lee, Jennifer Hayes, Clifton Colbert, Chad Donaldson, Jamil Campbell, Nichelle Kelly, Cynthia Liner and Cartina Mackey by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
January 14, 2019 Filing 130 NOTICE of Consents to Join Paulette Walker, Kevin Washington-Vernon, Erica Cotter, Monque Gardin, Michelle Wheeler, Kayla Eason, Jonnie Fuselier, Darla Smith, Annette Dupre, George Smith, Kimberly McClease, James Holland, Shane Christy, Christopher Price, Danny Bowie, Melvis Johnson and Lakaya Watson, by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
January 11, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE of Consents to Join Edie Blake, Felicia LaSalle, Joy Tabias, Sarah Hroszowy, Chelsie Bogel and Krescent Cooper by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
January 10, 2019 Filing 128 NOTICE of Consents to Join Shawn Greenwood, Jason Day, Jennifer Zinibi and Amy Bell by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
January 9, 2019 Filing 127 NOTICE of Consent to Join Mary Wedgeworth by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan : Estimated Trial Time: 10 days. Discovery due by 9/23/2019. Motions due by 10/21/2019. Mediation deadline set for 10/7/2019. Jury Trial set for 1/6/2020 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 1/9/19. (clc)
January 8, 2019 Filing 125 NOTICE of Consent to Join Jacob Bridge by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
January 7, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE of Consent to Join Jennifer Zinibi by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
January 7, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE of Consents to Join Roxanne Follenshee, Joseph W. Johnson, Mary Wynn, Lakeychee Burton, Angela Willis, Jasmine Black, Brian Brown, Cathryn Annas, Adrienne Autry and Jeffrey Lockhart by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
January 7, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE of Consent to Join Ashley Stinkler by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
January 4, 2019 Filing 121 NOTICE of Consents to Join Reginal Mathis, Mustapha Diouchi, Roger Brown, Sarah Dykes, Jennifer Teeter, Katrina Bennett and Donald Griffin by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
January 3, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE of Consent to Join Russell Daniels by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
January 3, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE of Consents to Join Ronetta Holt, Deron Charlton, Sonya jones, Christina Cope, Gail Martin, Sherika Smith, LaKaisha Houser, Denise Scott, Thomaselle Favor, Dawn Puntilto, Irene Rowell, Kim Hayes, Kelvin Mack, Melissa Alsten, Tiana McIvey, Destiny Causby, Aretha Fullard, Donna Lilley, Rashad Cofield, Anita Pennix, Teresa Johnson, Tiana Andrews, Ketjuan Lewis, Matthew McIntire and Yakima Nesbitt. by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consents to Join)(Jackson, Gordon)
January 2, 2019 Filing 118 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Johnson, Charles)
December 27, 2018 Filing 117 NOTICE of Consents to Join Sharon Hunt, Erica Frye, Maxwell Tyler Collins-Slifer, Cherrelle McGowan, Monte Wall, Elizabeth Phillips, Marsha Deveaux, Walter Bates, Jr., Hailee Holmes, Shannon Britt, Mary Anderson, Michael Wannamaker, Melissa Flanary, Jordan Kirby, Michael Griffith, Alonso Sinclair, Melissa Bonetti, Melissa Hunt (Matthews), Thaddeus Bracey, and Anna Hager. by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
December 20, 2018 Filing 116 NOTICE of Consents to Join Nicole Crawford, Brittany Hawkins, Sandra Clark, Tony Turner and Dana Locklear by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jackson, Gordon)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #114 Motion to Remove James R. McKoon from the Docket. James R. McKoon shall be removed from the docket as Defendants attorney. Defendants will continue to be represented by Brian L. Church and Charles E. Johnson of Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P.A. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/19/18. (mga)
December 19, 2018 Filing 114 Consent MOTION to Remove James R. McKoon from Docket by Bojangles' Restaurants, Incorporated, Bojangles', Inc.. Responses due by 1/2/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Johnson, Charles). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 19, 2018 Filing 113 NOTICE of Consents to Join Yutosha Alston, Autumn Spencer, Linell Means, Ricky Hannon, Kathy Jarose, Audrey Martin, Roelio Castrejon, Laura Mayo, Jonathan Miller, Dwight Wells, II, Antwon Clark, Shakia Johnson, Latoya Tyler, Juanita Washington, Robin Ransdell, Melissa Curtis, NatLee Wheeler, Sophia Bryant, Antonio Rosario, Timothy Walker, Claretha Howard, Toney Sanders, Alshane Harrison, Della Burroughs, Donna Young, Aaron Longwell, Deanna Jones, Angela Flint, Emily Black, Melanie Duncan, Melissa Kegley, Brandy Whisenant, Suzanne Cimmino, Mark Shanklin, Chloe Weiss, Melissa Deweese and Michael Forster by Barbara Thaxton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consents to Join)(Jackson, Gordon)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #110 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. James L. Holt, Jr. is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/18/18. (mga) Modified signature date on 1/3/2019 (rth).
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #109 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ms. Paula R. Jackson is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/18/18. (mga)
December 19, 2018 Notice to Gordon E. Jackson: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 12/26/2018. (mga)
December 19, 2018 Notice to James L. Holt, Jr.: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 12/26/2018. (mga)
December 19, 2018 Notice to Robert Turner: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 12/26/2018. (mga)
December 19, 2018 Notice to Nathaniel Bishop: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 12/26/2018. (mga)
December 19, 2018 Notice to Joseph Russ Bryant: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov, and File a motion pro hac vice. Deadline by 12/26/2018. (mga)
December 18, 2018 Filing 110 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James Holt Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3890697. by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton. (Strianese, Christopher). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 18, 2018 Filing 109 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Paula Jackson Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3890649. by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton. (Strianese, Christopher). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #104 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Robert E. Turner, IV is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/17/18. (mga)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #103 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Nathaniel A. Bishop is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/17/18. (mga)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #102 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Joseph Russ Bryant is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/17/18. (mga)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #101 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice.Mr. Gordon E. Jackson is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/17/18. (mga)
December 17, 2018 Filing 104 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Turner Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3889542. by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton. (Strianese, Christopher). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 17, 2018 Filing 103 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Nathaniel Bishop Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3889510. by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton. (Strianese, Christopher). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 17, 2018 Filing 102 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Russ Bryant Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3889494. by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton. (Strianese, Christopher). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 17, 2018 Filing 101 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Gordon Jackson Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3889456. by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton. (Strianese, Christopher). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 17, 2018 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Robert Strianese on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Strianese, Christopher)
December 13, 2018 Filing 99 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Eastern; Case Number 1:17-cv-00269. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #71 Motion to transfer; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), the Clerk is DIRECTED to TRANSFER this action to theUnited States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina, Charlotte Division. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/13/2018. (DJH, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
December 13, 2018 Case transferred to District of Western District of North Carolina (Charlotte). Certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (DJH, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
December 13, 2018 Notice to James L Holt Jr, Joseph Russ Bryant, Nathaniel Andrew Bishop, Paula R Jackson, Robert Emmett Turner IV, Gordon E Jackson, James R McKoon: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Associate local counsel and File a motion pro hac vice. Deadline by 12/20/2018. (rth)
December 13, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
December 13, 2018 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (rth)
December 12, 2018 Filing 97 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consents to Join Joanel Buchanan, Sheila Magazine, Timothy Burton, Carman Thompson, Cara Lyons and Kristian Batts (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 96 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consents to Join Norma Gilbert, Simone Garrett, Luiz Lopez, Jr., Elisha Stokes, Dennis Heller and LaToya Innocent (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 95 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consents to Join Denise Colter, Melissa Garcia, Shannon Lowry, Kasey Genaway, Elizabeth Robinson, Joseph Eudy, Darrell Shields, Alishia Williams, Phillip Whitfield, Sandra Carpenter, Melissa Brooks, Milton Jackson, Miranda Quinn, Nehemiah Sonner, Bonita Douglas, Mark Covington, Lakisha Griggs, Jennifer hilton, Tarina Najieb, Lesia Sanders, Felicia Massey, Karnel Phillips, Bobby Brown, Bryan Jackson, Chris Creason, Brittany Parry, Shannon Lowry, Tabitha Rodriguez, Tammi McGhee, Tabetha Best, Clausella Warren, Nancy Andrews, Teleisha Wakefield, Patricia Webb, Brian Kyser, Dawn Snyder, Silas Stevens, Robert S. Young, Sr., Lisa Odineal, Robin Gymer, Matthew Whitener, Cheryl Wallace and Charlene Beverly (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 94 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consent to Join Jessica Greene (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 93 REPLY to Response to Motion re #71 MOTION to Transfer filed by Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc., Bojangles', Inc.. (Johnson, Charles) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 92 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consents to Join Jessica Helton, Tonya Thomas, Kimberly Shumpert, Kiyanna Middleton and Karen Strachan. (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 91 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consents to Join William Abele, Christopher Workman, Constance King, Michael Blankenship, Kiara Saunders, Lorene Cannon, Stephanie Rouson, Rebecca Avery, Walter Fox, Lola Zatarain, Joel Thomas, Jared Jacobson, Mariah Malone, Tina Bettis, Paula Moore, Allison Jackson, Karmin Teague, Robert Colwell, David Tronco, Teresa Hallingquest, Jenny Ochoa and Eboney Johnson (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
December 5, 2018 Filing 90 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consents to Join Teresa McQueen and Robert Young (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 89 RESPONSE in Opposition re #71 MOTION to Transfer filed by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- E-mail Correspondence)(Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 88 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consents to Join Jennifer Hayes, Lavonette Augusta, Cornelius Stovall, Sheyanne Guyton, Calvin Jennings, Latoya Walker, Andrew Faulk and Clifton Colbert. (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 87 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consents to Join Elizabeth Brumfield, Ashley Currie, Paul Anderson, Sheyenne Dye, Toni Hawkins, Jasmine Mickens, Jessica LeSeure, Lisa White, Marquita Bryson, Stephanie Hopkins, Heather Verdier, Phyllis Roberts, Ciara Miller, Melissa Burgess, Geoffery Burgess, Sr., Kenneth Ramey, Jr., Jeffrey Sheldon, Akihiro Nakahira, Ruqayah Hayden,Annette Dupre, Rhonda Gary, William Price, Sr., Robert Spencer, Shawn Kay, Becky Price and Mary Jacobs (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 86 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consents to Join DeBorah McNeil, Christopher Borden, Shawanda Grant, Mary Kuehne, Shantel Campbell, Ralph Harman, Candy Stafford, Brittany McCune, LaShon Arrington, Mason McMullen, Tamileo Wakefield, Dennis Bronson, Kia Sumner, Calvin York, II, Brandi Thomas, Jerald Floyd, Gary Martin, Linda Keller, Brittany McDonald, Felicia Evans, Robert Alexander, Barry Manning, Jr., Juston Clark, Khairi Johnson, Andrew Reid, Patricia Lawton, Lesley Manns and Diane Phillips (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/3/2018. (DJH, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 84 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consents to Join Dahjaney Stanley, Erika Moore, Taitionia McClinton, Mary Driver and Calvin June (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 83 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consents to Join Cody McCord, Arthur Dixson, Joletha Walker, Jackie Fleming, Josh Tolleson, Lakisha Shepherd, Jessica Bowman, Domenique Butler, Shaniqua Parker, Gwendolyn McIntyre, Tishaun Clements-Bey, Nicholas Butler, Yvonne Eddings, Kateana Wade, Donald Williams, Ray Cockerham, Summer Cates, Melissa Huntley, Konni N. White, Alicia D. King, Theresa Harris, Alicia Patterson, Tammy Fauteux, Courtney Trivette McNair, Joshua Cook, Charmaine Prejean, Dale Wells, James Graham, Neischelle Anthony and Lavonette Augusta. (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 82 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consents to Join Khadijah Allen, Winston Kendall, Geneva Golden, Audrey Poore, Patricia Jones, Tiffany Kincaid and Teresa McQueen. (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 81 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consents to Join Eugene Coulange, Jonathan Barnes, Kim Cates, William Smith, Austin Waugh, Stephanie Harness, Christopher Callahan, Andrew Laney, Donna Hinson, Victory-Tori M. Mullis, Tiffany Mullis, Rosie Barrino, Amanda Knight, Gisella Leavitt, Guy Stoddard, Jaclyn Smothers, Robert Downey, Samuel Johnson, Crystal Kopp, Alex Raisch, Lafontrease Horton, Janice Locklear, Deborah Conner, Ivonne Zeledon, Dawn Brown, Myron Skinner, Mitchell Adair, Tyler Richard and Laura Durham. (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consents to Join Christy Goodson, Michael Hayes, Tammy Kiken, Michelle Legg, Yoisdenys Soca Perez, Ella Roper, Francesca Romero, Alexia Rudolph, Thomas Sokolowski, Ashley Sinkler, Taharka Slaughter, Carl Tomlinson, Bradley Watson, Ryan White and Everett Whitfield (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consent to Join Elisha Moody Stokes (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 78 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consents to Join Tori Higgs, Patience Case, Jeffery Hill and Kalynn White (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 77 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consents to Join Char Marlowe, Tyisha Green, Lucille Cunningham and Christina Moore (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consents to Join Rosie Eden, Catherine Floyd, Thomas Haverly, Lindsay Hoover, Cassandra McGregor, Nathan Miller and Jeffrey Thackston (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consents to Join Tere Conner, Mauricio Puerto, Kattah Feaster, April Hicks, Christina Parnell and Natasha Collymore (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consents to Join Michael Porter, Julius Williams, Jimmy Giriffin and Ardena McCants (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 73 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consents to Join Jonathan Martin, Jennifer Rabell and Angela Willis (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #71 MOTION to Transfer filed by Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc., Bojangles', Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jeannine Eubanks, #2 Exhibit B - Mayes Dep Excerpts)(Johnson, Charles) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 71 MOTION to Transfer by Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc., Bojangles', Inc.. (Johnson, Charles) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton OF MAILING OF THE NOTICE AND CONSENT FORMS TO THE PUTATIVE CLASS (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER; On October 31, 2018, the Court granted Plaintiffs motion for conditional certification but ordered the parties to submit a revised joint proposed written notice for the Courts final approval, as well as proposed language of the e-mail notice, including the subject line and language to be used in the body of the e-mail. (Doc. 67.) On November 13, 2018, the parties submitted their joint proposed notice. (Doc. 68-1.) The Court now APPROVES the parties proposed e-mail and written notices for distribution. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/14/2018. (DJH, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton of Filing of Joint Proposed Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Joint Proposed Notice)(Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #39 MOTION to Certify Class and for Expedited Issuance of Court-Supervised Notice to Putative Class Members filed by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton Status Conference set for 11/21/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/31/2018. (DJH, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
September 20, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consent to Join Kirstie Beasley (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
September 20, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consent to Join Helen Holland (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 64 RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION to Certify Class and for Expedited Issuance of Court-Supervised Notice to Putative Class Members - Supplemental filed by Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc., Bojangles', Inc.. (McKoon, James) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 MOTION to Certify Class and for Expedited Issuance of Court-Supervised Notice to Putative Class Members filed by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B- Supplemental Declarations)(Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION to Certify Class and for Expedited Issuance of Court-Supervised Notice to Putative Class Members filed by Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc., Bojangles', Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(McKoon, James) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Copy of docket mailed to both Attys Bishop and Turner granting PHV (DJH, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 7-6-18. (KMG, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER finding as moot #52 Motion for Protective Order upon Notice of withdrawal filed #59 .The hearing set for the motion #52 for July 10, 2018 is hereby cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 7/2/2018.This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. (SAC, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton of Withdrawal of Motion for Entry of a Protective Order (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consent to Join Trina McDowell (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Nathaniel Bishop) filed by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton, #45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton (Robert Emmett Turner, IV) . *It has been verfied that Attorneys Nathaniel Bishop and Robert Emmett Turner, IV have Applications for Admission pending. (BJL, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 57 SUPPLEMENT to #45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton. (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 56 SUPPLEMENT to #44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Nathaniel Bishop) Certificate of Good Standing by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton. (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consent to Join Valerie Yerrick (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consent to Join Vickie Jones (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #52 MOTION for Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2018 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1B - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger. (KMG, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION for Protective Order by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton. (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) #44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Nathaniel Bishop) : (DJH, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) #45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : (DJH, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 49 DISREGARD FILED IN ERROR SEE DOC. #51 (DJH, ). [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #46 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 6/20/2018. (DJH, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consents to Join Shandra Head and Brandon Hunter (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 46 Consent MOTION to Amend/Revise #36 Scheduling Order by Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc., Bojangles', Inc.. (McKoon, James) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton (Robert Emmett Turner, IV). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Robert E. Turner, IV)(Jackson, Gordon) Modified on 6/28/2018 (BJL, ). [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Nathaniel Bishop) by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nathaniel Bishop)(Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consent to Join Barbara Dinkins (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consent to Join Misty Hasty (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
May 2, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consent to Join Haron Sani (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
May 1, 2018 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #39 MOTION to Certify Class and for Expedited Issuance of Court-Supervised Notice to Putative Class Members filed by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Notice, #2 Exhibit B- Proposed Consent, #3 Exhibit C- Named Plaintiffs' Declarations, #4 Exhibit D- Opt-in Plaintiffs' Declarations)(Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
May 1, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION to Certify Class and for Expedited Issuance of Court-Supervised Notice to Putative Class Members by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton. (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
March 15, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE by Barbara Thaxton Consent to Join Kevin Moon (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
February 15, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER:Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 2/14/2018. (DJH, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
February 13, 2018 Filing 35 Consent MOTION to Amend/Revise #34 Scheduling Order by Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc., Bojangles', Inc.. (McKoon, James) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER:Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 2/8/2018. (DJH, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 33 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bojangles', Inc. for Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc.. (McKoon, James) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 32 ***FILED IN ERROR, SEE DOC #33 *** Certificate of Corporate Interest by Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc., Bojangles', Inc.. (McKoon, James) Modified on 1/31/2018 (BDG, ). [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 1/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 notice of consent/non-consent) (DJH, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
January 30, 2018 Filing 30 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/RegistrationForm.php; granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/RegistrationForm.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 1-30-18. (KMG, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
January 30, 2018 Filing 28 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc., Bojangles', Inc..(McKoon, James) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
January 30, 2018 Copy of docket mailed to Attys Johnson and Church showing order granting PHV (DJH, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
January 30, 2018 Copies of Order Regarding Availability & Consent/Non-consent form mailed to attorney's Charles Johnson & Brian Church (DJH, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
January 29, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #27 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Church ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3588426.) filed by Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc., Bojangles', Inc., #26 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles Johnson ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3588411.) filed by Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc., Bojangles', Inc. (GRE, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
January 26, 2018 Filing 27 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Church ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3588426.) by Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc., Bojangles', Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brian Church)(McKoon, James) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
January 26, 2018 Filing 26 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles Johnson ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3588411.) by Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc., Bojangles', Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charles Johnson)(McKoon, James) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
January 25, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton of Robin Brown's Consent to Join (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants have up to and including January 31, 2018 in which to respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 1-9-18. (KMG, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2018, at 02:00 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 1/9/2018. (CEA) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
January 5, 2018 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc., Bojangles', Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(McKoon, James) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
January 2, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton of Melissa Hickson's Consent to Join (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
January 2, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton of Stephanie Harness', Dustin Nelson's, Vickie Jones', and Kevin Conrad's Consents to Join (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
December 27, 2017 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara Thaxton, Angela Mayes. Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc. served on 12/22/2017. (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
December 27, 2017 Filing 18 REFILED See doc. no. #19 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Bojangles Restaurants, Inc. on 12/22/2017 (Jackson, Gordon) Modified on 12/27/2017, wrong event chosen , refiled. (SAC, ). [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
December 20, 2017 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara Thaxton, Angela Mayes. Bojangles', Inc. served on 12/20/2017. (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
October 19, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton of Patricia Price's Consent to Join (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton of Joshua Pruitt's Consent to Join (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
October 13, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton of Kizzy Haddon's Consent to Join (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
October 12, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton of Tiffany Gary's and Cheryl Tarantino's Consents to Join (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
October 11, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton of Seth Caldwells, Jacob Cecils, Brittany Chandlers, Shane Christys, Michelle Eakers, Thomas Eders, Chanelle Fords, Josh Halls, Michael Hayes, Vickie Jones, Marcial Lopezs, Karen Lorinskys, Shannon Lowrys, Elizabeth McManus, Kaylan Provences, Rebeka Royals, Wanda Saunders, Katie Smiths, Nehemiah Sonners, Holly Spisaks, Mark Anthony Turners, Gregory Wrights, and Mary Wynns Consents to Join (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton of Wanda Saunder's Consent to Join (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
October 2, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton of Phillip Simeon's Consent to Join (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
September 29, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton of Starkesha Smith's and Steven Jones' Consents to Join (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
September 28, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton of Dominiqueca Dubose's Consent to Join (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE by Angela Mayes, Barbara Thaxton of Tiana Andrews, Alicia Hollands, Deron Charltons, Tammi McGhees, Mialy Ezzells, Bryant Jacksons, Dayena Dabners, and Zachary Ledfords Consents to Join (Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 09/26/2017. (CAT) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 09/26/2017. (CAT) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 09/26/2017. (CAT) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint: Informational Only, No action to be taken. For future reference when filing summons please leave the date section on the summons blank. (CAT) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc., Bojangles', Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc.) (CAT) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Collective Action Complaint under the Fair Labor Standards Act) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3500231.), filed by Barbara Thaxton, Angela Mayes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons to be issued as to Defendant Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc., #5 Summons to be issued as to Defendant Bojangles', Inc.)(Jackson, Gordon) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]
September 26, 2017 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (CAT) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 12/13/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thaxton et al v. Bojangles' Restaurants, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Mayes
Represented By: James L Holt, Jr
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Nathaniel Andrew Bishop
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Paula R. Jackson
Represented By: Robert Emmett Turner, IV
Represented By: Robert E. Turner, IV
Represented By: Christopher Robert Strianese
Represented By: James L. Holt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Thaxton
Represented By: James L Holt, Jr
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Nathaniel Andrew Bishop
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Paula R. Jackson
Represented By: Robert Emmett Turner, IV
Represented By: Robert E. Turner, IV
Represented By: Christopher Robert Strianese
Represented By: James L. Holt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bojangles' Restaurants, Incorporated
Represented By: Charles E. Johnson
Represented By: James R. McKoon
Represented By: Brian Lee Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bojangles', Inc.
Represented By: Charles E. Johnson
Represented By: James R. McKoon
Represented By: Brian Lee Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?