Johns et al v. Allura USA LLC et al

Plaintiff: Donna Johns and Pamela Jean Frick
Defendant: Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Allura USA LLC, Plycem USA, Inc., Plycem USA LLC d/b/a Allura, Elementia USA, Inc. and Plycem USA LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00669
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling on Plaintiff Shara Guinn's Motion to Transfer Actions to the Southern District of Ohio by Pamela Jean Frick, Donna Johns. Responses due by 2/27/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Shara Guinn's Motion to Transfer Actions to the Southern District of Ohio, #2 Exhibit Unreported Cases)(Harris, Scott). Motions referred to David Keesler.
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan : Estimated Trial Time: 14 days. Discovery due by 11/6/2019. Motions due by 12/4/2019. Mediation deadline set for 11/20/2019. Jury Trial set for 3/2/2020 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/12/19. (clc)
February 4, 2019 Notice to Brian H. Callaway: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 2/11/2019. (mga)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Brian H. Callaway is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/4/19. (mga)
February 4, 2019 Notice to Leah Greenberg Katz: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 2/11/2019. (mga)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Leah Greenberg Katz is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/4/19. (mga)
February 4, 2019 Notice to Anthony Vale: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 2/11/2019. (mga)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Anthony Vale is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/4/19. (mga)
February 4, 2019 Notice to Robert L. Hickok: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 2/11/2019. (mga)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Robert L. Hickok is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/4/19. (mga)
February 4, 2019 Filing 29 Transfer Motion filed before the Judicial Panel MDL, Plaintiff Shara Guinn's Motion to transfer for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings to the Southern District of Ohio filed by Attorney William F. Cash, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter)(tob)
February 1, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Brathwaite, Ashley)
February 1, 2019 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Plaintiffs, filed by Donna Johns, Pamela Jean Frick.(Harris, Scott)
February 1, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Brian H. Callaway Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3927722. by Allura USA LLC, Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC, Plycem USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brathwaite, Ashley). Motions referred to David Keesler.
February 1, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Leah Greenberg Katz Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3927716. by Allura USA LLC, Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC, Plycem USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brathwaite, Ashley). Motions referred to David Keesler.
February 1, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Anthony Vale Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3927713. by Allura USA LLC, Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC, Plycem USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brathwaite, Ashley). Motions referred to David Keesler.
February 1, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert L. Hickok Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3927697. by Allura USA LLC, Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC, Plycem USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brathwaite, Ashley). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2), #13 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration, #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Plaintiffs Response due by 2/25/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail. Defendants Reply due by 3/15/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/23/19. (tob)
January 22, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motions To Dismiss by Pamela Jean Frick, Donna Johns. Responses due by 2/5/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harris, Scott). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 14, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by Elementia USA, Inc., Plycem USA LLC.(Brathwaite, Ashley) Modified on 1/15/2019 to remove filer (tmg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC. (Brathwaite, Ashley)
January 14, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Shawn Herrington re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC (Brathwaite, Ashley)
January 14, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC. Responses due by 1/28/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Brathwaite, Ashley)
January 14, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration by Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC. (Brathwaite, Ashley)
January 14, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Ashley Brathwaite re #13 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration filed by Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC (Brathwaite, Ashley)
January 14, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Shawn Herrington re #13 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration filed by Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC (Brathwaite, Ashley)
January 14, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration by Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC. Responses due by 1/28/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Brathwaite, Ashley)
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) by Elementia, S.A. de C.V.. (Brathwaite, Ashley)
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) of Juan Francisco Sanchez Kramer filed by Elementia, S.A. de C.V. (Brathwaite, Ashley)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2) by Elementia, S.A. de C.V.. Responses due by 1/28/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Brathwaite, Ashley)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting with modification #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Defendants shall have up to and including January 14, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/18/18. (mga)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal by Allura USA LLC, Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC, Plycem USA, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. State Notice of Filing)(Brathwaite, Ashley)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Allura USA LLC, Elementia USA, Inc., Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA LLC, Plycem USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brathwaite, Ashley). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 18, 2018 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brl)
December 18, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D. Hammond on behalf of All Defendants (Hammond, Joseph)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Elementia, S.A. de C.V. (Brathwaite, Ashley)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Elementia USA, Inc. (Brathwaite, Ashley)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plycem USA LLC d/b/a Allura (Brathwaite, Ashley)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite on behalf of All Defendants (Brathwaite, Ashley)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Union County Superior Court, case number 18 CVS 02955. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3889245), filed by Elementia USA, Inc., Plycem USA LLC d/b/a Allura, Allura USA LLC, Elementia, S.A. de C.V., Plycem USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B. Allura Limited Warranty)(Brathwaite, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johns et al v. Allura USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elementia, S.A. de C.V.
Represented By: Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite
Represented By: Joseph D. Hammond
Represented By: Anthony Vale
Represented By: Leah Greenberg Katz
Represented By: Brian H. Callaway
Represented By: Robert L. Hickok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allura USA LLC
Represented By: Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite
Represented By: Joseph D. Hammond
Represented By: Anthony Vale
Represented By: Leah Greenberg Katz
Represented By: Brian H. Callaway
Represented By: Robert L. Hickok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plycem USA, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite
Represented By: Joseph D. Hammond
Represented By: Anthony Vale
Represented By: Leah Greenberg Katz
Represented By: Brian H. Callaway
Represented By: Robert L. Hickok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plycem USA LLC d/b/a Allura
Represented By: Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite
Represented By: Joseph D. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elementia USA, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite
Represented By: Joseph D. Hammond
Represented By: Anthony Vale
Represented By: Leah Greenberg Katz
Represented By: Brian H. Callaway
Represented By: Robert L. Hickok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plycem USA LLC
Represented By: Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite
Represented By: Joseph D. Hammond
Represented By: Anthony Vale
Represented By: Leah Greenberg Katz
Represented By: Brian H. Callaway
Represented By: Robert L. Hickok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Johns
Represented By: Scott Crissman Harris
Represented By: Daniel Kent Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Jean Frick
Represented By: Scott Crissman Harris
Represented By: Daniel Kent Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?