Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Rensselaer Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., PWMP Acquisition I LLC, Song 6 Music, Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC, Hot-Cha Music Co., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., Zombies Ate My Publishing, Reservoir Media Management Inc., Peer International Corporation, Lost Boys Music, Forthefallen Publishing, The Bernard Edwards Company LLC, BMG Rights Management (US) LLC, EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Unichappell Music Inc., Bernard Edwards Company LLC and Reservoir One America
Defendant: The Rensselaer Group, LLC, Jeffrey A. Edwards and Rensselaer Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00011
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., Zombies Ate My Publishing, Broadcast Music, Inc., Lost Boys Music, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Bernard Edwards Company LLC, Forthefallen Publishing, PWMP Acquisition I LLC, Song 6 Music, BMG Rights Management (US) LLC, Hot-Cha Music Co., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., Unichappell Music Inc., Reservoir Media Management Inc., Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC, Peer International Corporation. Defendants Rensselaer Group, LLC and Jeffrey Edwards served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service as to The Rensselaer Group, LLC d/b/a The Bar at 316, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service as to Jeffrey A. Edwards, individually)(Kapp, Michael) Modified text on 1/23/2019 (brl).
January 9, 2019 Filing 22 REPORT on the filing or determination of a copyright action regarding copyright numbers contained in Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (brl) (Main Document 22 replaced on 1/9/2019) (brl).
January 9, 2019 Filing 21 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jeffrey A. Edwards, Rensselaer Group, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons - Edwards)(brl)
January 9, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
January 8, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. (Kapp, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Songs of Universal, Inc. (Kapp, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peer International Corporation (Kapp, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BMG Rights Management (US) LLC (Kapp, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Song 6 Music (Kapp, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Reservoir Media Management Inc. (Kapp, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Forthefallen Publishing (Kapp, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zombies Ate My Publishing (Kapp, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC (Kapp, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lost Boys Music (Kapp, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. (Kapp, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EMI Al Gallico Music Corp. (Kapp, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Bernard Edwards Company LLC (Kapp, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sony/ATV Songs LLC (Kapp, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PWMP Acquisition I LLC (Kapp, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Unichappell Music Inc. (Kapp, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hot-Cha Music Co. (Kapp, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc. (Kapp, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Keith Kapp on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kapp, Michael)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3904313), filed by EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., Zombies Ate My Publishing, Broadcast Music, Inc., Lost Boys Music, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., The Bernard Edwards Company LLC, Forthefallen Publishing, PWMP Acquisition I LLC, Song 6 Music, BMG Rights Management (US) LLC, Hot-Cha Music Co., EMI Al Gallico Music Corp., Unichappell Music Inc., Reservoir Media Management Inc., Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC, Peer International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Song Schedule, #2 Cover Sheet)(Kapp, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Rensselaer Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PWMP Acquisition I LLC
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Song 6 Music
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hot-Cha Music Co.
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zombies Ate My Publishing
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reservoir Media Management Inc.
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peer International Corporation
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lost Boys Music
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forthefallen Publishing
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bernard Edwards Company LLC
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMG Rights Management (US) LLC
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Al Gallico Music Corp.
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unichappell Music Inc.
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Edwards Company LLC
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reservoir One America
Represented By: Michael Keith Kapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rensselaer Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rensselaer Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?