Benham v. Branch Banking and Trust Company
Plaintiff: Matthew Benham
Defendant: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00093
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Stay re Notice to Conduct Initial Attorneys Conference,,, Set for April 29, 2019 by Branch Banking and Trust Company. Responses due by 5/10/2019 (Winters, Elizabeth). Motions referred to David Keesler.
April 17, 2019 Notice to jtrigg@kilpatricktownsend.com: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 4/24/2019. (mga)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. James A. Trigg is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant Branch Banking and Trust Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/12/19. (mga)
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James A. Trigg Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3993403. by Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Wenker, Jason). Motions referred to David Keesler.
April 10, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney no longer assigned to the case due to conflict. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(thh)
April 10, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 4/29/2019. (rth)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Branch Banking and Trust Company (Wenker, Jason)
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Branch Banking and Trust Company.(Wenker, Jason) Modified text on 4/10/2019 (rth).
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting with modification #5 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Branch Banking and Trust Company shall have up to and including April 9, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/20/19. (mga)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATED Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Branch Banking and Trust Company (Wenker, Jason) Modified text on 3/20/2019 (mga). Modified event type on 3/21/2019 (rth).
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of a copyright action regarding copyright numbers VA 2-135-552. (jaw)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Branch Banking and Trust Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (jaw)
February 26, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (jaw)
February 26, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(jaw)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Matthew Benham (Hudson, Seth)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Branch Banking and Trust Company with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3951325), filed by Matthew Benham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Benham Photograph, #2 Exhibit B - Photograph Public Display)(Hudson, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benham v. Branch Banking and Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Lager Winters
Represented By: Jason M. Wenker
Represented By: James Albert Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Benham
Represented By: Seth Lee Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?