Carter v. Pellicane et al

Plaintiff: Dianne Michele Carter
Defendant: Gregory Allyn Forest, Thomas Pellicane and Barbara Yates
Case Number: 3:2019cv00104
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Max O Cogburn
2 Judge: Cameron M Currie
3 Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Thomas Pellicane. US Attorney General served on 03/25/2019. (brj)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Thomas Pellicane served on 03/21/2019. (brj)
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Barbara Yates served on 03/18/2019. (brj)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Gregory Allyn Forest served on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019; Thomas Pellicane served on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019; Barbara Yates served on 3/18/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (brj) Modified date filed on 3/22/2019 (rth).
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Gregory Allyn Forest served on 3/19/2019. (brj) Modified text on 3/21/2019 (eef).
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Gregory Allyn Forest, Thomas Pellicane, Barbara Yates, US Attorney and US Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM285 Forms)(eef) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/14/2019) (brl).
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The U.S. Marshal shall serve process upon the Defendants at the expense of the United States Government. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 3/13/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
March 11, 2019 Motion referred to Shiva V. Hodges.: #2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis (eef)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Designation of Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/11/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
March 11, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Cameron M. Currie and Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges. District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr, Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(eef)
March 4, 2019 Motion referred to David S. Cayer.: #2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis (brj)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Pro Se MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dianne Michele Carter. (brj). Motions referred to Hodges , Shiva V.. Modified text on 3/11/2019 (eef).
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against Gregory Allyn Forest, Thomas Pellicane, Barbara Yates, filed by Dianne Michele Carter. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(brj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Pellicane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Allyn Forest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Pellicane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Michele Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?