Red Rock Management Agency, LLC v. Host Gator.com, LLC

Plaintiff: Red Rock Management Agency, LLC
Defendant: Host Gator.com, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00106
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 12:1833
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Red Rock Management Agency, LLC (Love, Kenneth)
March 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Red Rock Management Agency, LLC. Host Gator.com, LLC served on 3/12/2019, answer due 4/2/2019. (Love, Kenneth)
March 4, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Host Gator.com, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3956698), filed by Red Rock Management Agency, LLC.(Love, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Red Rock Management Agency, LLC v. Host Gator.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Rock Management Agency, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Love, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Host Gator.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?