Robinson v. Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P.A. et al

Plaintiff: Sharika M Robinson
Defendant: Robert E Harrington, Jonathan C Krisko, Gregory L Skidmore, Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P.A. and Allen K Robertson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00109
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Robert E Harrington, Jonathan C Krisko, Allen K Robertson, Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P.A., Gregory L Skidmore. (Johnson, Charles)
May 2, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Robert E Harrington, Jonathan C Krisko, Allen K Robertson, Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P.A., Gregory L Skidmore. Responses due by 5/16/2019 (Johnson, Charles). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying as moot #17 Motion for Clarification of Order Reassigning Case and Conditional Objections to Transfer of Venue and Conditional Request to Reconsider. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/4/2019. (tmg)
April 1, 2019 Notice to Jocelyn Cuttino: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 4/8/2019. (brl)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Jocelyn Cuttino for Robert E Harrington, Jonathan C Krisko, Allen K Robertson, Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P.A., and Gregory L Skidmore. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 4/1/2019. (brl) Modified text on 4/11/2019 (rth).
April 1, 2019 Notice to Grace Speights: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 4/8/2019. (brl)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Grace Speights for Robert E Harrington, Jonathan C Krisko, Allen K Robertson, Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P.A., and Gregory L Skidmore. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 4/1/2019. (brl) Modified text on 4/11/2019 (rth).
March 29, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jocelyn R. Cuttino Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3982448. by Robert E Harrington, Jonathan C Krisko, Allen K Robertson, Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P.A., Gregory L Skidmore. (Johnson, Charles). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
March 29, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Grace E. Speights Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3982434. by Robert E Harrington, Jonathan C Krisko, Allen K Robertson, Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P.A., Gregory L Skidmore. (Johnson, Charles). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
March 29, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for clarification by Sharika M Robinson. Responses due by 4/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Caruso, Carmen). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
March 28, 2019 SECOND Notice to Linda Chatman: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 4/4/2019. (tmg)
March 27, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Reed Van Kampen on behalf of All Defendants (Van Kampen, Joshua)
March 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E. Johnson on behalf of Robert E Harrington, Jonathan C Krisko, Allen K Robertson, Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P.A., Gregory L Skidmore (Johnson, Charles)
March 20, 2019 Notice to Attorney Linda C. Chatman: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 3/27/2019. (ejb)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Linda C. Chatman for Sharika M Robinson. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 3/20/2019. (ejb)
March 20, 2019 Notice to Attorney Carmen D. Caruso: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 3/27/2019. (ejb)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Carmen D. Caruso for Sharika M Robinson. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 3/20/2019. (ejb)
March 20, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr, Magistrate Judge David Keesler no longer assigned to the case. Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf: #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Carmen D. Caruso Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3963253., #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Linda C. Chatman Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3963254. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(thh)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sharika M Robinson. Gregory L Skidmore waiver sent on 3/4/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (Doucette, Thomas)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sharika M Robinson. Robert E Harrington waiver sent on 3/4/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (Doucette, Thomas)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sharika M Robinson. Jonathan C Krisko waiver sent on 3/4/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (Doucette, Thomas)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sharika M Robinson. Allen K Robertson waiver sent on 3/4/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (Doucette, Thomas)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sharika M Robinson. Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P.A. waiver sent on 3/4/2019, answer due 5/3/2019. (Doucette, Thomas)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Sharika M Robinson. Amendment to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Linda C. Chatman Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3963254. Removes Addendum; Adds Certificate of Service (Doucette, Thomas)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Sharika M Robinson. Amendment to #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Carmen D. Caruso Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3963253. Removes Addendum; Adds Certificate of Service (Doucette, Thomas)
March 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Linda C. Chatman Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3963254. by Sharika M Robinson. (Doucette, Thomas). Motions referred to David Keesler.
March 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Carmen D. Caruso Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3963253. by Sharika M Robinson. (Doucette, Thomas). Motions referred to David Keesler.
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Charles E. Johnson on 03/04/2019 by Sharika M Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Waiver Request for A Robertson, #2 Waiver Request for R Harrington, #3 Waiver Request for J Krisko, #4 Waiver Request for G Skidmore)(Doucette, Thomas)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sharika M Robinson (Doucette, Thomas)
March 4, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(jaw)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3956878), filed by Sharika M Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(Doucette, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E Harrington
Represented By: Jocelyn R. Cuttino
Represented By: Joshua Reed Van Kampen
Represented By: Charles E. Johnson
Represented By: Grace E. Speights
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan C Krisko
Represented By: Jocelyn R. Cuttino
Represented By: Joshua Reed Van Kampen
Represented By: Charles E. Johnson
Represented By: Grace E. Speights
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory L Skidmore
Represented By: Jocelyn R. Cuttino
Represented By: Joshua Reed Van Kampen
Represented By: Charles E. Johnson
Represented By: Grace E. Speights
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P.A.
Represented By: Jocelyn R. Cuttino
Represented By: Joshua Reed Van Kampen
Represented By: Charles E. Johnson
Represented By: Grace E. Speights
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen K Robertson
Represented By: Jocelyn R. Cuttino
Represented By: Joshua Reed Van Kampen
Represented By: Charles E. Johnson
Represented By: Grace E. Speights
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharika M Robinson
Represented By: Thomas Gregory Doucette
Represented By: Linda Carrol Chatman
Represented By: Carmen D. Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?