Pickup & Go Moving International, Inc. et al v. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

Plaintiff: Pickup & Go Moving International, Inc. and Antoine Johnson
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00112
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1691
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pickup & Go Moving International, Inc. (Vann, Christopher)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. (Watson, Kristen)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Antoine Johnson, Pickup & Go Moving International, Inc. (Vann, Christopher)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M Vann on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vann, Christopher)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. Responses due by 4/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Watson, Kristen). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's Answer due March 27, 2019. SO ORDERED. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 03/08/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(DLG)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. (Watson, Kristen). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (Watson, Kristen)
March 6, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from General Court of Justice, Superior Court Division, case number 19 CVD 1692. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3959809), filed by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court File)(Watson, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickup & Go Moving International, Inc. et al v. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pickup & Go Moving International, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M Vann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Johnson
Represented By: Christopher M Vann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Represented By: Kristen P. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?