US Foods, Inc. v. White Oak Manor - Charlotte, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: US Foods, Inc.
Defendant: White Oak Manor - Charlotte, Inc. and White Oak Management, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00227
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/3/20. (mga)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/3/20. (mga)
September 2, 2020 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by US Foods, Inc.. Responses due by 9/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Confidentiality Protective Order) (MacHarg, Jeffrey). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 26, 2020 Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 2/19/2021. Motions due by 3/29/2021. Mediation deadline set for 3/8/2021. Jury Trial set for 7/6/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Robert J. Conrad Jr. (mga)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Joint Motion to Modify Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan. The deadlines in this case are revised as follows:Expert Reports December 14, 2020 (party with burden);January 14, 2021 (responsive expert reports);Discovery completion February 19, 2021;Mediation Report March 8, 2021;Dispositive Motions March 29, 2021; andJury Trial July 6, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/26/20. (mga)
August 25, 2020 Filing 25 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #21 Scheduling Order, Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan by White Oak Management, Inc.. Responses due by 9/8/2020 (Levy, David). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 13, 2020 Filing 24 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by David L. Levy, Kristy Marie D'Ambrosio on behalf of White Oak Manor - Charlotte, Inc., White Oak Management, Inc., Attorney Thomas Jonathan Clark and John Elliott Rogers, II terminated. (Levy, David)
April 15, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Jonathan Clark on behalf of All Defendants (Clark, Thomas)
March 30, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by US Foods, Inc..(MacHarg, Jeffrey)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: Three (3) to Five (5) Days. Face Discovery due by 8/20/2020. Expert Discovery due by 10/21/2020. Motions due by 11/20/2020. Mediation deadline set for 11/4/2020. Jury Trial set for 5/3/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Robert J. Conrad Jr. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/16/2020. (brl)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge's #18 Memorandum and Recommendations; denying Plaintiff's #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/16/2020. (brl)
March 13, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Hirsch, Alexandra)
February 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: CIAC Report due by 3/13/2020. (mga)
February 21, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS on #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by US Foods, Inc. Objections to M&R due by 3/6/2020. The parties shall file a Certificate of Initial Attorney's Conference pursuant to Local Rule 16.1, on or before March 13, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/21/20. (mga)
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by US Foods, Inc.. (MacHarg, Jeffrey)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by White Oak Management, Inc., White Oak Manor - Charlotte, Inc. Replies due by 8/28/2019 (Rogers, John)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by US Foods, Inc. Responses due by 8/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims, #2 Exhibit 1 - Use of Equipment Agreement)(MacHarg, Jeffrey). Motions referred to David Keesler.
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 Defendant's Answer and Counterclaims. Plaintiff US Foods, Inc. shall have up to and including August 12, 2019 to respond to Defendants' counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/2/19. (mga)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Extension of Time to Answer Defendants' Counterclaims by US Foods, Inc. Responses due by 7/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hirsch, Alexandra). Motions referred to David Keesler.
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by White Oak Management, Inc. (Rogers, John)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by White Oak Manor - Charlotte, Inc. (Rogers, John)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against US Foods, Inc. by White Oak Manor - Charlotte, Inc., White Oak Management, Inc..(Rogers, John)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by US Foods, Inc.. White Oak Management, Inc. served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019; White Oak Manor - Charlotte, Inc. served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Confirmation White Oak Management, Inc., #2 Exhibit B Confirmation White Oak Manor - Charlotte, Inc.)(MacHarg, Jeffrey) Modified attachment description on 6/4/2019 (rth).
May 30, 2019 Notice to Matthew J. Caccamo: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 6/6/2019. (mga)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Matthew J. Caccamo is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiff US Foods, Inc.Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/30/19. (mga)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. John S. Letchinger is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiff US Foods, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/30/19. (mga)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew J. Caccamo . Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4042253. by US Foods, Inc.. (Hirsch, Alexandra). Motions referred to David Keesler.
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John S. Letchinger Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4042250. by US Foods, Inc.. (Hirsch, Alexandra). Motions referred to David Keesler.
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to White Oak Management, Inc., White Oak Manor - Charlotte, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons - White Oak Management, Inc.)(brl)
May 13, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra J. Hirsch on behalf of US Foods, Inc. (Hirsch, Alexandra)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by US Foods, Inc. (MacHarg, Jeffrey)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against White Oak Manor - Charlotte, Inc., White Oak Management, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4025462), filed by US Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MacHarg, Jeffrey) Modified text on 5/24/2019 (rth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Foods, Inc. v. White Oak Manor - Charlotte, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Oak Manor - Charlotte, Inc.
Represented By: John Elliott Rogers, II
Represented By: Thomas Jonathan Clark
Represented By: David L. Levy
Represented By: Kristy Marie D'Ambrosio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Oak Management, Inc.
Represented By: John Elliott Rogers, II
Represented By: Thomas Jonathan Clark
Represented By: David L. Levy
Represented By: Kristy Marie D'Ambrosio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Phillips MacHarg
Represented By: Matthew J. Caccamo
Represented By: Alexandra J. Hirsch
Represented By: John S. Letchinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?