Reid v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Reid
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 3:2019cv00242
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: David Keesler
2 Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan : Estimated Trial Time: four to five (4-5) days. Discovery due by 2/7/2020. Motions due by 3/6/2020. Mediator Designation deadline set for 8/1/2019. Mediation deadline set for 2/21/2020. Jury Trial set for 8/3/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Magistrate Judge David C. Keesler. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/6/19. (mga) Modified text on 6/7/2019 (mga).
June 6, 2019 Added Magistrate Judge David Keesler as presider; Magistrate Judge David Keesler no longer assigned as referral judge and Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney no longer assigned to case as presider. (mga)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan . ALL Parties Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation of Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction)(Davis, Justin)
May 23, 2019 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer no longer assigned to the case due to conflict. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(thh)
May 22, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Davis, Justin)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from General Court of Justice - Superior Court Division - Anson County, case number 18-cvs-457. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4035176), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Consent Order Allowing Substitution of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Dismissal of Walmart, Inc., #4 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss and Answer, #5 Cover Sheet)(Davis, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Reid
Represented By: Derek Gustavus Crawford
Represented By: Erica Renee Nesmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Justin N. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?