Reid v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: SHANE REID
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2019cv00245
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM as to Nancy Berryhill. US Attorney General served on 06/07/2019. (cb)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM as to Nancy Berryhill. Social Security Administration served on 06/04/2019. (cb)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney, served on 5/30/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (brl)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Nancy A. Berryhill, US Attorney and US Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM285 - SSA, #2 USM285 - USAO, #3 USM285 - USAG)(brl) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/28/2019) (brl).
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/28/2019. (brl)
May 24, 2019 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shane Reid . (Clauson, Vaughn) (brj).
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Shane Reid .(Clauson, Vaughn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANE REID
Represented By: Vaughn Stephen Clauson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?