Lineberger v. Rinehart Property Management, Inc et al
Appellee: Rinehart Property Management, Inc and Warren L. Tadlock
Appellant: Vincent Lineberger
Case Number: 3:2019cv00256
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 TEXT ONLY Bankruptcy Scheduling Order.The appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days. The appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days after service of the appellant's brief. The appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee's brief. This is pursuant to Rule 8018(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. Any extensions of time will be granted only upon a showing of good cause. Appellant Brief due by 8/15/2019. (brj)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Appeal Record Certificate of Readiness -designations of parties submitted herewith - documents to be accessed through BK ECF system (bkbfm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy is submitting: Amended Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election filed June 13, 2019 re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (bkCH)
June 4, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court case number 16-30960, filed by Vincent Lineberger. (Attachments: #1 Order re:Appeal)(bkCH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lineberger v. Rinehart Property Management, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rinehart Property Management, Inc
Represented By: Stacy C. Cordes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Warren L. Tadlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Vincent Lineberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?