Day v. Winfrey et al

Plaintiff: Freda J. Day
Defendant: Oprah Winfrey, Lionsgate Entertainment Corporation, Own: Oprah Winfrey Network, LLC, Craig Wright and Harpo Productions
Case Number: 3:2019cv00277
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by OWN: Oprah Winfrey Network, LLC. OWN: Oprah Winfrey Network, LLC waiver sent on 7/27/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. (rys)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Oprah Winfrey. Oprah Winfrey waiver sent on 7/27/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. (rys)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Harpo Productions. Harpo Productions waiver sent on 7/27/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. (rys)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freda J. Day. Craig Wright served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (ctb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lionsgate Entertainment Corporation. Lionsgate Entertainment Corporation waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Cottrell, Eric)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric H. Cottrell on behalf of Lionsgate Entertainment Corporation (Cottrell, Eric)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of a copyright action regarding copyright numbers TXu001093123. (brl)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Conventionally as to All Defendants. (brl)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CHD054614), filed by Freda J. Day.(brl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Day v. Winfrey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freda J. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oprah Winfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lionsgate Entertainment Corporation
Represented By: Eric H. Cottrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Own: Oprah Winfrey Network, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harpo Productions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?