Global Financial Credit, LLC v. Liberty Medical Diagnostics, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Global Financial Credit, LLC
Defendant: Liberty Medical Diagnostics Center, LLC, Dustin Luis Ray and Vector Operations, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00283
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Nobles, Daniel)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Global Financial Credit, LLC (Bridgmon, Charles)
July 25, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 8/13/2019. (ams)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by Liberty Medical Diagnostics Center, LLC, Dustin Luis Ray, Vector Operations, LLC.(Nobles, Daniel)
June 24, 2019 Notice to Matthew S. Muckleroy: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 7/1/2019. (mga)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Matthew S. Muckleroy is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendants Liberty Medical Diagnostics Center, LLC, Dustin Luis Ray, and Vector Operations, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/24/19. (mga)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Defendants shall have up to and including July 18, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/24/19. (mga)
June 24, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brj)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew S. Muckleroy Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4070806. by Liberty Medical Diagnostics Center, LLC, Dustin Luis Ray, Vector Operations, LLC. (Nobles, Daniel). Motions referred to David Keesler.
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Liberty Medical Diagnostics Center, LLC, Dustin Luis Ray, Vector Operations, LLC. (Nobles, Daniel). Motions referred to David Keesler.
June 21, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Valecia M. McDowell on behalf of LIBERTY MEDICAL DIAGNOSTICS CENTER, LLC, DUSTIN LUIS RAY, VECTOR OPERATIONS, LLC (McDowell, Valecia)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIBERTY MEDICAL DIAGNOSTICS CENTER, LLC, DUSTIN LUIS RAY, VECTOR OPERATIONS, LLC (Nobles, Daniel)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 19-CVS-8024. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4068996), filed by DUSTIN LUIS RAY, LIBERTY MEDICAL DIAGNOSTICS CENTER, LLC, VECTOR OPERATIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Nobles, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Financial Credit, LLC v. Liberty Medical Diagnostics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Medical Diagnostics Center, LLC
Represented By: Valecia M. McDowell
Represented By: Daniel Jared Nobles, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew S. Muckleroy
Represented By: Matthew Steven Muckleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Luis Ray
Represented By: Valecia M. McDowell
Represented By: Daniel Jared Nobles, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew S. Muckleroy
Represented By: Matthew Steven Muckleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vector Operations, LLC
Represented By: Valecia M. McDowell
Represented By: Daniel Jared Nobles, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew S. Muckleroy
Represented By: Matthew Steven Muckleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Financial Credit, LLC
Represented By: William P. Bray
Represented By: Charles Jonathan Bridgmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?