Scott v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Scott
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC., Trans Union, LLC. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00294
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Corey, Chelsea)
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC..(Corey, Chelsea)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Corey on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Corey, Chelsea)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Brathwaite, Ashley)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Brathwaite, Ashley)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Brathwaite, Ashley)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Cowan deRosset, IV on behalf of Trans Union, LLC. (deRosset, Robert)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Trans Union, LLC. answer due 9/3/2019. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 08/06/2019. (DLG)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Trans Union, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(deRosset, Robert). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC. (deRosset, Robert)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Bank of America, N.A.'s answer due 9/4/2019. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 08/02/2019. (DLG)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extension of Time)(Urps, Tonya). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. (Urps, Tonya)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Tonya L. Urps on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Urps, Tonya)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bank of America, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(brj)
June 26, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4075360), filed by Timothy Scott. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Bank of America, N.A. - Summons, #3 Equifax Information Services, LLC. - Summons, #4 Experian Information Solutions, Inc. - Summons, #5 Trans Union, LLC. - Summons)(Bennett, Leonard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Tonya L. Urps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC.
Represented By: Chelsea Corey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC.
Represented By: Robert Cowan deRosset, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Scott
Represented By: Leonard Anthony Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?