Gerber National Claim Services, LLC v. Carolina Technology Exchange, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gerber National Claim Services, LLC
Defendant: Carolina Technology Exchange, LLC and BlueVine Capital, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00301
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants BlueVine Capital, Inc. and Carolina Technology Exchange, LLC shall have up to and including August 28, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/8/19. (mga)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint,, by BlueVine Capital, Inc.. (Southerland, Jeffrey). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Wyatt Andrews, II on behalf of BlueVine Capital, Inc. (Andrews, Richard)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Southerland on behalf of BlueVine Capital, Inc. (Southerland, Jeffrey)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to BlueVine Capital, Inc., served on 07/22/2019 (ctb)
July 11, 2019 Interpleader Deposit Received (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) in the amount of $38336.20 (ctb)
July 11, 2019 Entry Deleted. Refiled
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335). Authorized deposit in the amount of $38,117.63; granting in part and denying in part #5 Motion for TRO and Service of Process. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/2/19. (clc)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Carolina Technology Exchange, LLC., BlueVine Capital, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons - BlueVine Capital, Inc.)(brl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/3/2019: #2 USMS 285-CTE, #3 USMS 285 BVC) (clc).
June 28, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brl)
June 28, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Service of Process Authorized by 28 USC 2361 by Gerber National Claim Services, LLC. (Loper, Johnny)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Service of Process Authorized by 28 USC 2361 by Gerber National Claim Services, LLC. Responses due by 7/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Loper, Johnny)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Gerber National Claim Services, LLC. (Loper, Johnny)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Gerber National Claim Services, LLC. Responses due by 7/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Loper, Johnny)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gerber National Claim Services, LLC (Loper, Johnny)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4077911), filed by Gerber National Claim Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Member Participation Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Assignment, #3 Exhibit C - Second Notice of Assignment, #4 Exhibit D - Email Traffic, #5 Exhibit E - UCC-1 Lien, #6 Exhibit F - Invoice and Purchase Security Agreement, #7 Exhibit G - Accounts Payable Report, #8 Exhibit H - CTE Demand Letter, #9 Exhibit I - BlueVine Demand Letter)(Loper, Johnny) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/28/2019) (cb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerber National Claim Services, LLC v. Carolina Technology Exchange, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolina Technology Exchange, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlueVine Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Wyatt Andrews, II
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Southerland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerber National Claim Services, LLC
Represented By: Johnny M. Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?