Bruce v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Plaintiff: Leisa Bruce
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 3:2019cv00308
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/28/2019. (brj)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 3-4 days. Discovery due by 6/17/2020. Motions due by 7/27/2020. Mediation deadline set for 3/9/2020. Jury Trial set for 11/16/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/27/2019. (brj)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan Certificate and Report of F.R.C.P. 26(f) Conference and Discovery Plan (Adams, Julie)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. Responses due by 9/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order)(Adams, Julie)
July 31, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 8/21/2019. (brj)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Adams, Julie) Modified on 8/2/2019 to remove duplicate wording(rth).
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond is hereby GRANTED. Defendants' deadline to file their response to Plaintiff's Complaint is on or before July 31, 2019. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/8/2019. (STB)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, or Otherwise Respond by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Adams, Julie)
July 3, 2019 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. (Adams, Julie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Adams, Julie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 19CVS8632. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4084229), filed by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service of Process Received by Each Defendant, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Adams, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Julie K. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Julie K. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leisa Bruce
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Murphy
Represented By: Sean Franklin Herrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?