Ehmann v. Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Douglas P Ehmann and Douglas P. Ehmann
Defendant: Joseph R. Kluttz, III, Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC and Joseph R. Klutt, III
Case Number: 3:2019cv00311
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss by Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC, Joseph R. Klutt, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Spencer, Joshua)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss by Douglas P. Ehmann. Replies due by 8/13/2019 (Davies, Kenneth)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Douglas P. Ehmann.(Davies, Kenneth)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #3 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 8/7/2019. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 07/24/2019. (DLG)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Douglas P. Ehmann. Responses due by 8/7/2019 (Davies, Kenneth). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of and Acknowledgement of Removal by Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC, Joseph R. Klutt, III (Spencer, Joshua)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Joseph R. Klutt, III. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Spencer, Joshua)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Douglas P. Ehmann by Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Spencer, Joshua)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC, Joseph R. Klutt, III. Responses due by 7/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Service)(Spencer, Joshua). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Douglas P. Ehmann (Davies, Kenneth)
July 8, 2019 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Magistrate Judge David Keesler no longer assigned to the case due to conflict. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(mek)
July 8, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(mek)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg, case number 19-CVS-10657. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4085139), filed by Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC, Joseph R. Kluttz, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Process and Pleadings Filed in the State Court Action, #2 Exhibit Disclosure by Non-Governmental Corporate Party)(Spencer, Joshua) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/28/2019) (eef).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ehmann v. Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Kluttz, III
Represented By: Joshua D. Spencer
Represented By: Charles Monroe Sprinkle, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC
Represented By: Joshua D. Spencer
Represented By: Charles Monroe Sprinkle, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Klutt, III
Represented By: Joshua D. Spencer
Represented By: Charles Monroe Sprinkle, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas P Ehmann
Represented By: Kenneth Theodore Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas P. Ehmann
Represented By: Kenneth Theodore Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?