Roddy v. Columbus McKinnon Corporation
Plaintiff: Tammy Roddy
Defendant: Columbus McKinnon Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00322
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 3 days (3). Discovery due by 1/15/2020. Motions due by 2/17/2020. Mediation deadline set for 1/29/2020. Jury Trial set for 6/15/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/19/2019. (brj)
August 19, 2019 Notice to Joshua H. Viau: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 8/26/2019. (brj)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Joshua H. Viau for Columbus McKinnon Corporation. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 08/19/2019. (brj)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joshua H. Viau Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4139034. by Columbus McKinnon Corporation. (Mancl, Holly)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Mancl, Holly)
July 25, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 8/15/2019. (ams)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Service by Columbus McKinnon Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of letter to Mr. Leitner enclosing Case Assignment Packet)(Mancl, Holly)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Columbus McKinnon Corporation.(Mancl, Holly)
July 11, 2019 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Columbus McKinnon Corporation (Mancl, Holly)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Anson County Superior Court, case number 19-CVS-231. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4090892), filed by Columbus McKinnon Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Cover Sheet)(Mancl, Holly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roddy v. Columbus McKinnon Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Roddy
Represented By: Thomas Courtenay Leitner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbus McKinnon Corporation
Represented By: Holly Nicole Mancl
Represented By: Joshua H. Viau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?