Hardin v. SteelFab, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Hardin
Defendant: SteelFab, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00323
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: David Keesler
2 Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 2-3 days. Discovery due by 5/29/2020. Motions due by 6/29/2020. Mediation deadline set for 6/15/2020. Ready Date for Trial set 12/21/2020 09:31 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/3/19. (tob)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Douglas, Sarah)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 9/5/2019. (ams)
August 12, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney no longer assigned to the case due to conflict. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(thh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SteelFab, Inc. (Wood, Stacy)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by SteelFab, Inc..(Wood, Stacy)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by John Hardin. SteelFab, Inc. served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Chestnut, Jason)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to SteelFab, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (mek)
July 11, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (mek)
July 11, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(mek)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SteelFab, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4092047), filed by John Hardin.(Chestnut, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardin v. SteelFab, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SteelFab, Inc.
Represented By: Stacy K. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hardin
Represented By: Jason S. Chestnut
Represented By: Philip J. Gibbons, Jr
Represented By: Craig Lorne Leis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?