Guenther v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A. et al
Plaintiff: John E. Guenther
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A. and Does 1-100
Case Number: 3:2019cv00328
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by John E. Guenther.(Gessner, L.)
August 20, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 9/10/2019. (brj)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal by Wells Fargo Bank N.A..(Weddington, Keith)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint) by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Weddington, Keith)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint) by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Weddington, Keith)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Altman Frick on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Frick, Eric)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Wells Fargo Bank N.A. answer due 8/19/2019. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 7/16/2019. (brl)
July 12, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal (Complaint) by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(Weddington, Keith)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Weddington, Keith)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4094090), filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Guenther State Court File)(Weddington, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guenther v. Wells Fargo Bank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Keith Michael Weddington
Represented By: Eric Altman Frick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Guenther
Represented By: L. Michelle Gessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?