Global Merchandising Services, Ltd. v Various John Does, Jane Does and ABC Companies
Plaintiff: Global Merchandising Services, Ltd.
Defendant: ABC Companies, Does and Various John Does, Jane Does and ABC Companies
Case Number: 3:2019cv00331
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ORDER OF SEIZURE. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/29/19. (clc)
July 29, 2019 Minute Entry: SHOW CAUSE/PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING held before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney. Plaintiffs attorney: Kenneth Feinswog (via phone). Court reporter: Jill Turner. (clc)
July 28, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT re #6 Order to Show Cause, by Global Merchandising Services, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Feinswog, Kenneth)
July 19, 2019 Bond Deposit with Court re: #6 Order to Show Cause, $ 5000.00, receipt number CHD055136, by Global Merchandising Services, Ltd. (McDermott, Richard). (rys)
July 19, 2019 Notice to Kenneth A. Feinswog: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 7/26/2019. (mga)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Kenneth A. Feinswog is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiff Global Merchandising Services, Ltd. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/18/19. (mga)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kenneth A. Feinswog Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4101313. by Global Merchandising Services, Ltd.. (McDermott, Richard). Motions referred to David Keesler.
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER FOR SEIZURE, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/29/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney. Show Cause Response due by 7/24/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/17/19. (clc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mek)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to ABC Companies, Does. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (mek)
July 15, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (mek)
July 15, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(mek)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT AND UNFAIR COMPETITION against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4095489), filed by Global Merchandising Services, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McDermott, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Merchandising Services, Ltd. v Various John Does, Jane Does and ABC Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Various John Does, Jane Does and ABC Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Merchandising Services, Ltd.
Represented By: Richard M. McDermott
Represented By: Kenneth Alan Feinswog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?