Burch v. USA
Petitioner: Amos Lamar Burch
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00335
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Se MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by Amos Lamar Burch. Responses due by 9/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amendment, #2 Envelope)(ctb)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO ANSWER 2255 MOTION as to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). Response due by 9/24/2019. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 7/26/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ams)
July 16, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 Pro SE MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) ( USA2255Group added.), filed by Amos Lamar Burch. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(brj) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/17/2019) (brl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burch v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amos Lamar Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?