William Ives Consulting, Inc. v. Guardian IT Systems, LLC et al
Plaintiff: William Ives Consulting, Inc.
Defendant: Thomas Brame, Mark Kuljian, Eric Wenger, Guardian IT Systems, LLC and Volunteer Capital Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00336
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan B. Felts on behalf of All Defendants (Felts, Alan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Stratton, Daniel)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants.. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on August 5, 2019. (DC)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Nathan Duggins, III on behalf of All Defendants (Duggins, J.)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Thomas Brame, Guardian IT Systems, LLC, Mark Kuljian, Volunteer Capital Group, LLC, Eric Wenger. (Stratton, Daniel)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel David Stratton on behalf of All Defendants (Stratton, Daniel)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by William Ives Consulting, Inc.. Guardian IT Systems, LLC served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (White, William)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by William Ives Consulting, Inc.. Volunteer Capital Group, LLC served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (White, William)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by William Ives Consulting, Inc.. Eric Wenger served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (White, William)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark White on behalf of All Plaintiffs (White, William)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(brj)
July 16, 2019 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4097839), filed by William Ives Consulting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Melville, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William Ives Consulting, Inc. v. Guardian IT Systems, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Brame
Represented By: J. Nathan Duggins, III
Represented By: Daniel David Stratton
Represented By: Alan B. Felts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kuljian
Represented By: J. Nathan Duggins, III
Represented By: Daniel David Stratton
Represented By: Alan B. Felts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Wenger
Represented By: J. Nathan Duggins, III
Represented By: Daniel David Stratton
Represented By: Alan B. Felts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian IT Systems, LLC
Represented By: J. Nathan Duggins, III
Represented By: Daniel David Stratton
Represented By: Alan B. Felts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volunteer Capital Group, LLC
Represented By: J. Nathan Duggins, III
Represented By: Daniel David Stratton
Represented By: Alan B. Felts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ives Consulting, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Daniel Melville
Represented By: William Mark White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?