Carolina Fire Control, Inc. v. Markel Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Carolina Fire Control, Inc.
Defendant: Markel Corporation and Evanston Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00354
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Max O Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 4 days. Discovery due by 4/3/2020. Motions due by 4/17/2020. Mediation deadline set for 11/15/2019. Ready date for Trial set for 8/17/2020 09:31 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/4/19. (tob)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Fennell, Richard)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, by Markel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy)(Goanos, T.) Modified text on 8/26/2019 (brl).
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy)(Goanos, T.) Modified text on 8/26/2019 (brl).
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Evanston Insurance Company, Market Corporation by Carolina Fire Control, Inc. (Fennell, Richard) Modified text on 8/26/2019 (brl).
August 6, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 8/27/2019. (clc)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Markel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy)(Goanos, T.)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy)(Goanos, T.)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carolina Fire Control, Inc. (Fennell, Richard)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Markel Corporation (Goanos, T.)
July 22, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Evanston Insurance Company, Markel Corporation (Goanos, T.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg Superior, case number 19-CVS-12448. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4105163), filed by Markel Corporation, Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Policy, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Removal to Opposing Counsel, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Goanos, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carolina Fire Control, Inc. v. Markel Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolina Fire Control, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Louis Horner
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Hood
Represented By: Richard B Fennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markel Corporation
Represented By: T. Nicholas Goanos
Represented By: Lewis Andrew Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: T. Nicholas Goanos
Represented By: Lewis Andrew Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?