Snyder v. Skinner
Plaintiff: Shelley Snyder and Shelley R. Snyder
Defendant: Richard Skinner and Richard A. Skinner
Case Number: 3:2019cv00355
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Shelley R. Snyder (Everage, Charles)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT re #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Richard A. Skinner (Santaniello, Andrew)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Richard A. Skinner. Responses due by 9/13/2019 (Santaniello, Andrew). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Shelley R. Snyder. All Defendants. (Everage, Charles)
July 30, 2019 DELETED ENTRY - DOCKETED IN ERROR (brl).
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Richard Skinner. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (mek)
July 22, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(mek)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard Skinner with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4105281), filed by Shelley Snyder.(Everage, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder v. Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Snyder
Represented By: Charles A. Everage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley R. Snyder
Represented By: Charles A. Everage
Represented By: Kaitlyn B. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Skinner
Represented By: Andrew James Santaniello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?