National Practice Transitions, LLC v. Thompson
Plaintiff: NATIONAL PRACTICE TRANSITIONS, LLC
Defendant: Amanda Thompson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00358
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 15:5
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Consent ORDER granting #9 Motion to Stay and Compel Arbitration. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/9/2019. (mek)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Support re #9 MOTION to Stay and Compel Arbitration by National Practice Transitions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Arbitration Demand and Related Filings)(Wagner, Sean) Modified duplicate text on 8/29/2019 (brj).
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Stay and Compel Arbitration by Amanda Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Houti, Jennifer)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Stay and Compel Arbitration by Amanda Thompson. (Houti, Jennifer)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay and Compel Arbitration by Amanda Thompson. Responses due by 9/4/2019 (Houti, Jennifer). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Michelle Houti on behalf of All Defendants (Houti, Jennifer)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam L. Ross on behalf of Amanda Thompson (Ross, Adam)
August 19, 2019 TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion to Expedite. The instant motion fails to satisfy the requirements of LCvR 7.1(b). Although the motion indicates the parties have conferred and "discussed several issues related to Plaintiffs Complaint and pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction," it fails to indicate whether the parties attempted to resolve any areas of disagreement related to the instant motion and the relief sought therein. The motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to be refiled in compliance the Local Rules of the WDNC. (TM)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule on Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing and Consideration by National Practice Transitions, LLC. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Wagner, Sean)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by National Practice Transitions, LLC. Amanda Thompson served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Wagner, Sean)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Amanda Thompson. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brl)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Practice Transitions, LLC (Wagner, Sean)
July 24, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brj)
July 24, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by National Practice Transitions, LLC . Responses due by 8/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Wagner, Sean)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amanda Thompson with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4108018), filed by National Practice Transitions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Wagner, Sean) Modified text on 7/24/2019 (brj). Modified attachment descriptions on 7/25/2019 (rth).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Practice Transitions, LLC v. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL PRACTICE TRANSITIONS, LLC
Represented By: Sean C. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Thompson
Represented By: Adam L. Ross
Represented By: Jennifer Michelle Houti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?