Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V. et al v. TEC Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Philips India Ltd., Philips North America LLC and Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V.
Defendant: Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Peak Trust Company-AK, TEC Holdings, Inc. and Robert Andrew Wheeler
Case Number: 3:2019cv00373
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David W. Higer Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4199089. by Robert Andrew Wheeler. (Raynal, Charles). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 27, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Lora A. Brzezynski Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4199082. by Robert Andrew Wheeler. (Raynal, Charles). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 27, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Thatcher A. Rahmeier Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4199079. by Robert Andrew Wheeler. (Raynal, Charles). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 25, 2019 Filing 32 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Robert Andrew Wheeler. Responses due by 10/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Joint Motion to Dismiss)(Jackson, J.)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #27 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Peak Trust Company-AK shall have up to and including October 4, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/24/19. (mga)
September 23, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Peak Trust Company-AK. (Grover, Ryan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Charles Grover on behalf of Peak Trust Company-AK (Grover, Ryan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. Replies due by 9/27/2019 (MacHarg, Jeffrey)
September 19, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Peak Trust Company-AK. (Reschly, Marla). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 10, 2019 Filing 26 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Marla Tun Reschly on behalf of Peak Trust Company-AK, Attorney Elena Faria Mitchell and Thomas D. Myrick terminated. (Reschly, Marla)
August 26, 2019 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peak Trust Company-AK (Myrick, Thomas)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #19 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including September 25, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/22/19. (mga)
August 22, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Elena Faria Mitchell on behalf of Peak Trust Company-AK (Mitchell, Elena)
August 22, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison Mann Gates on behalf of TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. (Gates, Harrison)
August 22, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. (Jackson, J.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TEC Holdings, Inc. (Jackson, J.)
August 21, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Peak Trust Company-AK, TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Robert Andrew Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order granting Extension)(Jackson, J.). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Christopher Jackson on behalf of TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. (Jackson, J.)
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Kivus on behalf of TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. (Kivus, John)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E. Raynal, IV on behalf of Robert Andrew Wheeler (Raynal, Charles)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Vincent Carey on behalf of Robert Andrew Wheeler (Carey, Stephen)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas D. Myrick on behalf of Peak Trust Company-AK (Myrick, Thomas)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips North America LLC. TEC Holdings, Inc. served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Delivery)(Heyl, Jonathan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips North America LLC. Peak Trust Company-AK served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Delivery)(Heyl, Jonathan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Delivery)(Heyl, Jonathan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Delivery)(Heyl, Jonathan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips North America LLC. Robert Andrew Wheeler served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Delivery)(Heyl, Jonathan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips North America LLC. Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Delivery)(Heyl, Jonathan)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Robert Andrew Wheeler, Peak Trust Company-AK. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons - Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., #2 Summons - Robert Andrew Wheeler, #3 Summons - Robert Andrew Wheeler as Officer, #4 Summons - Robert Andrew Wheeler as Executor, #5 Summons - Peak Trust Company-AK)(mek)
July 31, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(mek)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philips India Ltd. (Heyl, Jonathan)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philips North America LLC (Heyl, Jonathan)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V. (Heyl, Jonathan)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Unredacted Document (Sealed - Attorney) (available to Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC, TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Robert Andrew Wheeler) (Heyl, Jonathan)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Sealed Filing by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC (Heyl, Jonathan)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REDACTED against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4116931), filed by Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips India Ltd., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Georgia Order, #2 Exhibit 2 Georgia Protective Order)(Heyl, Jonathan) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/31/2019) (mek).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V. et al v. TEC Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.
Represented By: J. Christopher Jackson
Represented By: Harrison Mann Gates
Represented By: John T. Kivus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peak Trust Company-AK
Represented By: Marla Tun Reschly
Represented By: Thomas D. Myrick
Represented By: Ryan Charles Grover
Represented By: Elena Faria Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEC Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: J. Christopher Jackson
Represented By: Harrison Mann Gates
Represented By: John T. Kivus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Andrew Wheeler
Represented By: Stephen Vincent Carey
Represented By: Charles E. Raynal, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips India Ltd.
Represented By: Jonathan P. Heyl
Represented By: Jeffrey Phillips MacHarg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips North America LLC
Represented By: Jonathan P. Heyl
Represented By: Jeffrey Phillips MacHarg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V.
Represented By: Jonathan P. Heyl
Represented By: Jeffrey Phillips MacHarg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?