MCI Communications Services, Inc. et al v. Thayer Power & Communication Line Construction Company, LLC
Plaintiff: MCImetro Access Transmission Services Corp. and MCI Communications Services, Inc.
Defendant: Thayer Power & Communication Line Construction Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00379
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Thayer Power & Communication Line Construction Company, LLC.(Drayton, Amy)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thayer Power & Communication Line Construction Company, LLC (Drayton, Amy)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Thayer Power & Communication Line Construction Company, LLC shall have up to and including September 30, 2019 to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/30/19. (mga)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Thayer Power & Communication Line Construction Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Drayton, Amy). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy C. Drayton on behalf of Thayer Power & Communication Line Construction Company, LLC (Drayton, Amy)
August 6, 2019 Notice to Katie N. Wagner: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 8/13/2019. (mga)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Katie N. Wagner is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs MCI Communications Services, Inc. and MCImetro Access Transmission Services Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/6/19. (mga)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. James J. Proszek is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs MCI Communications Services, Inc. and MCImetro Access Transmission Services Corp.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/6/19. (mga)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Thayer Power & Communication Line Construction Company, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (mek)
August 2, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. Motions referred to David Keesler: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Katie N. Wagner Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4121425., #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James J. Proszek Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4121411. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(mek)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Katie N. Wagner Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4121425. by MCI Communications Services, Inc., MCImetro Access Transmission Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Byrne, Michael)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James J. Proszek Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4121411. by MCI Communications Services, Inc., MCImetro Access Transmission Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Byrne, Michael)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCImetro Access Transmission Services Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Byrne, Michael)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCI Communications Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Byrne, Michael)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thayer Power & Communication Line Construction Company, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4121278), filed by MCI Communications Services, Inc., MCImetro Access Transmission Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Byrne, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCI Communications Services, Inc. et al v. Thayer Power & Communication Line Construction Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCImetro Access Transmission Services Corp.
Represented By: Michael J. Byrne
Represented By: James J. Proszek
Represented By: Katie Naomi Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCI Communications Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Byrne
Represented By: James J. Proszek
Represented By: Katie Naomi Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thayer Power & Communication Line Construction Company, LLC
Represented By: Amy C. Drayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?