Quinn v. NC Department of Healthcare and Family Services
Plaintiff: Richard Quinn, Jr.
Defendant: NC Department of Healthcare and Family Services and North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 3:2019cv00391
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wake County Court Order, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Kristen Sigmon)(Greene, Deborah)
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services. Responses due by 10/21/2019 (Greene, Deborah)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 Pro Se MOTION for Entry of Default by Richard Quinn, Jr. (ctb)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard Quinn, Jr (ctb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard Quinn, Jr (ctb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Quinn, Jr. North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (ctb) Modified service & answer date on 9/23/2019 (brl).
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 Mail ( #6 Order) addressed to Richard Quinn, Jr. returned as undeliverable. (ctb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued Conventionally as to North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services. (ctb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 Pro Se AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, filed by Richard Quinn, Jr.(ctb)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting with modification #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant NC Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall file an Answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, on or before September 26, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/9/19. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive document by NC Department of Healthcare and Family Services. Responses due by 9/20/2019 (Greene, Deborah). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Nobling Greene on behalf of NC Department of Healthcare and Family Services (Greene, Deborah)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Quinn, Jr., NC Department of Healthcare and Family Services served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (ctb) Modified file date on 8/20/2019 (brl).
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Conventionally as to Division of Child Services and NC Child Support Collections. (ctb)
August 9, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Case Assignment Packet. And #Initial Scheduling Order and Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The document was served conventionally at case filing (ctb)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against Division of Child Services and NC Child Support Collections ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CHD055478), filed by Richard Quinn, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(ctb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinn v. NC Department of Healthcare and Family Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Quinn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NC Department of Healthcare and Family Services
Represented By: Deborah Nobling Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Deborah Nobling Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?