Mitchell v. SunTrust Bank
Plaintiff: Lonnie Robert Mitchell
Defendant: SunTrust Bank
Case Number: 3:2019cv00402
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #11 Notice (Other) by SunTrust Bank. (Rudd, Jamie)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Acceptance to General Executor's Office by Lonnie Robert Mitchell (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(brj)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by SunTrust Bank. (Rudd, Jamie)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 Pro Se NOTICE of Judicial Notice to Enforce by Lonnie Robert Mitchell (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(brj)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand by SunTrust Bank. Replies due by 9/18/2019 (Rudd, Jamie)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 Pro Se RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lonnie Robert Mitchell. Replies due by 9/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Affidavit of Fact and Truth, #3 Exhibits A thru B, #4 Envelope)(brj)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 Pro Se MOTION to Remand by Lonnie Robert Mitchell. Responses due by 9/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(brj)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ROSEBORO ORDER Setting Response Deadline re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Responses due by 9/10/2019 Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/27/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brj)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by SunTrust Bank. (Rudd, Jamie)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by SunTrust Bank. Responses due by 9/5/2019 (Rudd, Jamie)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SunTrust Bank re Case Assigned/Reassigned, (Rudd, Jamie)
August 20, 2019 Pro Se Law Clerk Referral to PSLC: 1 per Judge's request. (eef)
August 19, 2019 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SunTrust Bank (Rudd, Jamie)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Elizabeth Rudd on behalf of SunTrust Bank (Rudd, Jamie)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 19 CVS 12919. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4140154), filed by SunTrust Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rudd, Jamie) Modified document descrition on 8/19/2019 (brj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. SunTrust Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Robert Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Bank
Represented By: Jamie Elizabeth Rudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?