Stewart v. GM Financial et al
Plaintiff: Natashia Stewart
Defendant: GM Financial, Cynthia Turner, Michael Allman, Catrina Jett-Cameron, Shawndra Thomas and Kenya Todd
Case Number: 3:2019cv00411
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Michael Allman, GM Financial, Catrina Jett-Cameron, Shawndra Thomas, Kenya Todd, Cynthia Turner. (Spaugh, Patrick)
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Michael Allman, GM Financial, Catrina Jett-Cameron, Shawndra Thomas, Kenya Todd, Cynthia Turner. (Spaugh, Patrick)
October 4, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Natashia Stewart. GM Financial served on 10/7/2019 per USPS Website, answer due 10/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Envelope)(ctb)
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Natashia Stewart. Michael Allman served on 10/3/2019 per USPS Website, answer due 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Envelope)(ctb)
October 4, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Natashia Stewart. Shawndra Thomas served on 10/3/2019 per USPS Website, answer due 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Envelope)(ctb)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Natashia Stewart. Cynthia Turner served on 10/3/2019 per USPS Website, answer due 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Envelope)(ctb)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Natashia Stewart. Catrina Jett-Cameron served on 10/3/2019 per USPS Website, answer due 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Envelope)(ctb)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Natashia Stewart. Kenya Todd served on 10/3/2019 per USPS Website, answer due 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Envelope)(ctb)
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Reissued Conventionally as to Michael Allman, GM Financial, Catrina Jett-Cameron, Shawndra Thomas, Kenya Todd, Cynthia Turner. (ctb)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 Pro Se RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Natashia Stewart. Replies due by 10/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lora Stabford, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(ctb)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 Pro Se RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Natashia Stewart. Replies due by 10/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lora Stabford, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(ctb)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER and NOTICE Setting Response Deadline re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Responses due by 10/4/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 9/18/19. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Lee Rainey on behalf of All Defendants (Rainey, Richard)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GM Financial (Spaugh, Patrick)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Michael Allman, GM Financial, Catrina Jett-Cameron, Shawndra Thomas, Kenya Todd, Cynthia Turner. (Spaugh, Patrick)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Michael Allman, GM Financial, Catrina Jett-Cameron, Shawndra Thomas, Kenya Todd, Cynthia Turner. Responses due by 10/1/2019 (Spaugh, Patrick)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Michael Allman, GM Financial, Catrina Jett-Cameron, Shawndra Thomas, Kenya Todd, Cynthia Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Lora Stanford)(Spaugh, Patrick)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Michael Allman, GM Financial, Catrina Jett-Cameron, Shawndra Thomas, Kenya Todd, Cynthia Turner. Responses due by 10/1/2019 (Spaugh, Patrick) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/18/2019) (rys).
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Conventionally as to All Defendants. (mek)
August 22, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Case Assignment Packet. And #Initial Scheduling Order and Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The document was served conventionally at case filing (mek)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CHD055636), filed by Natashia Stewart. (Attachments: #1 EEOC Charge of Discrimination, #2 Correspondence with Counsel, #3 Exhibit)(mek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. GM Financial et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GM Financial
Represented By: Patrick G. Spaugh
Represented By: Richard Lee Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Turner
Represented By: Patrick G. Spaugh
Represented By: Richard Lee Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Allman
Represented By: Patrick G. Spaugh
Represented By: Richard Lee Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catrina Jett-Cameron
Represented By: Patrick G. Spaugh
Represented By: Richard Lee Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawndra Thomas
Represented By: Patrick G. Spaugh
Represented By: Richard Lee Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenya Todd
Represented By: Patrick G. Spaugh
Represented By: Richard Lee Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natashia Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?