Monti Antonio S.P.A. v. Sublitech, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Monti Antonio S.P.A.
Defendant: Sublitech, Inc. and John E. Carroll
Case Number: 3:2019cv00412
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Max O Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to John E. Carroll, Sublitech, Inc. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (ams)
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Entry of Default of Defandants by Monti Antonio S.P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Affidavit)(Williamson, Andrew)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/26/2019. (ams)
September 25, 2019 Minute Entry: MOTION HEARING held before District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. Re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion granted, Order to follow. Plaintiffs attorney: Abbey Krysak, Andrew Williamson. Court reporter: Cheryl Nuccio. (ams)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Abbey Mrkus Krysak on behalf of Monti Antonio S.P.A. (Krysak, Abbey)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monti Antonio S.P.A. re #11 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, (Williamson, Andrew)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monti Antonio S.P.A. re #11 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, (Williamson, Andrew)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr.. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/17/2019. (ams)
September 16, 2019 NOTICE of Cancellation of Motion Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2019. (ams)
September 9, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ams)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Monti Antonio S.P.A.. Sublitech, Inc. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Williamson, Andrew)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Monti Antonio S.P.A.. John E. Carroll served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Williamson, Andrew)
August 28, 2019 Notice to Andrew M. Williamson: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/4/2019. (mga)
August 28, 2019 Notice to Theodore J. Folkman: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/4/2019. (mga)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Theodore J. Folkman for Monti Antonio S.P.A.; granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Andrew M. Williamson for Monti Antonio S.P.A. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/28/19. (mga)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew M. Williamson Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4154762. by Monti Antonio S.P.A.. (Caudill, Bo). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Theodore J. Folkman Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4154751. by Monti Antonio S.P.A.. (Caudill, Bo). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monti Antonio S.P.A. (Caudill, Bo)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (brj)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to John E. Carroll, Sublitech, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(brj)
August 23, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Monti Antonio S.P.A.. Responses due by 9/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Affidavit of Theodore J. Folkman, #3 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Theodore J. Folkman)(Caudill, Bo)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4148788), filed by Monti Antonio S.P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Caudill, Bo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monti Antonio S.P.A. v. Sublitech, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monti Antonio S.P.A.
Represented By: Bo Brandon Caudill
Represented By: Theodore Joel Folkman
Represented By: Andrew Michael Williamson
Represented By: Abbey Mrkus Krysak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sublitech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?