Stallings v. Shook & Fletcher Insulation Co et al
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Stallings
Defendant: Shook & Fletcher Insulation Co., Sean Robert Fowler and Sunbelt Industrial Co., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00426
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 24 Miscellaneous Filing by Sean Robert Fowler, Sunbelt Industrial Co., Inc.. re: #19 Amended Complaint Acceptance of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bradshaw, James)
September 27, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mary Ann Stallings re #22 Miscellaneous Filing (Eadon, Sherod)
September 27, 2019 Filing 22 Miscellaneous Filing by Mary Ann Stallings. Last Clear Chance (Eadon, Sherod)
September 24, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint by Sean Robert Fowler, Sunbelt Industrial Co., Inc..(Bradshaw, James)
September 16, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Issued Electronically as to Sunbelt Industrial Co., Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brl)
September 11, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Mary Ann Stallings.(Goings, Robert)
September 10, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Sean Robert Fowler. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bradshaw, James)
September 6, 2019 Notice to Robert F. Goings: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/13/2019. (tob)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Robert Goings for Mary Ann Stallings. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/6/19. (tob)
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shook & Fletcher Insulation Co. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kelly, Christopher)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mary Ann Stallings re #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Goings Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4166916. (Eadon, Sherod)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Goings Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4166916. by Mary Ann Stallings. (Eadon, Sherod). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
September 4, 2019 Notice to James A. Bradshaw: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/11/2019. (tob)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Daniel Bowman White for Sean Robert Fowler; granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added James Andrew Bradshaw for Sean Robert Fowler. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/4/19. (tob)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James A. Bradshaw Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4161583. by Sean Robert Fowler, Shook & Fletcher Insulation Co.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kelly, Christopher). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel B. White Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4161577. by Sean Robert Fowler, Shook & Fletcher Insulation Co.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kelly, Christopher). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Kelly on behalf of Sean Robert Fowler, Shook & Fletcher Insulation Co. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kelly, Christopher)
September 4, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 9/25/2019. (rth)
September 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Sean Robert Fowler answer due 9/3/2019. (rth)
September 3, 2019 Notice to Daniel Bowman White, James Andrew Bradshaw: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Associate local counsel and File a motion pro hac vice. Deadline by 9/10/2019. (rth)
September 3, 2019 Notice to Jessica Lee Gooding, Robert Fredrick Goings: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to File a motion pro hac vice. Deadline by 9/10/2019. (rth)
September 3, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 0:19-cv-02369. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/29/2019.(cbru, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 9/3/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Shook & Fletcher Insulation Co.(Bradshaw, James) [Transferred from South Carolina on 9/3/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Change Venue by Shook & Fletcher Insulation Co. Response to Motion due by 9/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Bradshaw, James) [Transferred from South Carolina on 9/3/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for York County County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Acknowledgment of State Clerk of Court)(Bradshaw, James) [Transferred from South Carolina on 9/3/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET - Private Entry. (asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 9/3/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Shook & Fletcher Insulation Co.(asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 9/3/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from York County, case number 2019-CP-46-02495. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8631063), filed by Shook & Fletcher Insulation Co. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 9/3/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stallings v. Shook & Fletcher Insulation Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Stallings
Represented By: Robert Goings
Represented By: Sherod Hampton Eadon, III
Represented By: Jessica Lee Gooding
Represented By: Robert F. Goings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shook & Fletcher Insulation Co.
Represented By: Daniel Bowman White
Represented By: James Andrew Bradshaw
Represented By: James A. Bradshaw
Represented By: Christopher M. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Robert Fowler
Represented By: Daniel Bowman White
Represented By: James A. Bradshaw
Represented By: Christopher M. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbelt Industrial Co., Inc.
Represented By: James A. Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?