Parrish v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Mary Parrish
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00440
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
2 Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Notice to Jason Murphy: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Associate local counsel and File a motion pro hac vice. Deadline by 11/14/2019. (tmg)
November 4, 2019 SECOND Notice to Brandon Rich: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Associate local counsel and File a motion pro hac vice. Deadline by 11/12/2019. (tmg)
October 24, 2019 Case reassigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell. Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney no longer assigned to the case. Any pending hearings are cancelled. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Starr on behalf of All Defendants (Starr, William)
September 13, 2019 Notice of compliance deadline extended to 9/27/2019. (rth)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Paul Joseph Osowski on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated, Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated. (Osowski, Paul)
September 9, 2019 Notice to Brandon L Rich: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Associate local counsel and File a motion pro hac vice. Deadline by 9/16/2019. (rth)
September 9, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (rth)
September 9, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Western District of North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Submission, #2 Motions In Limine Orders, #3 Daubert Orders, #4 Discovery Orders, #5 Deposition Designaton Orders, #6 Miscellaneous Orders, #7 Discovery and Privilege Orders, #8 Master and Short-Form Pleadings, #9 Case Management Orders)(rth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2019: #10 MDL-Bard-Certified Docket) (rth).
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-02871. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
September 6, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to Western District of North Carolina via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-2871-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16875545 filed by Mary Parrish. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parrish v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Paul Joseph Osowski
Represented By: William M. Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Paul Joseph Osowski
Represented By: William M. Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Parrish
Represented By: Brandon L Rich
Represented By: Jason Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?