Philips North America, LLC et al v. Zimmerman
Plaintiff: Philips India Ltd., Philips North America LLC, Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Koninklijke Philips N.V., philips medical system technologies ltd., philips medical systems (cleveland), Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc. and Philips North America, LLC
Defendant: dustin jay zimmerman
Case Number: 3:2019cv00444
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P. Heyl on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Heyl, Jonathan)
October 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Dustin Jay Zimmerman answer due 11/12/2019. (clc)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have through and including November 12, 2019 within which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/02/2019. (STB)
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Dustin Jay Zimmerman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carey, Stephen)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Vincent Carey on behalf of Dustin Jay Zimmerman (Carey, Stephen)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E. Raynal, IV on behalf of Dustin Jay Zimmerman (Raynal, Charles)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Philips North America, LLC, Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc., Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips India Ltd.. Dustin Jay Zimmerman served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. (MacHarg, Jeffrey)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Dustin Jay Zimmerman. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brj)
September 11, 2019 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Koninklijke Philips N.V. (MacHarg, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd. (MacHarg, Jeffrey) Modified text on 9/11/2019 (brj).
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland) (MacHarg, Jeffrey) Modified text on 9/11/2019 (brj).
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V. (MacHarg, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philips India Ltd. (MacHarg, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philips North America, LLC (MacHarg, Jeffrey) Modified text on 9/11/2019 (brj).
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4172230), filed by Philips North America, LLC, Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Philips Medical System Technologies Ltd., Philips India Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Philips-Zimmerman Agreement, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Registration)(MacHarg, Jeffrey) Modified text on 9/11/2019 (brj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philips North America, LLC et al v. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dustin jay zimmerman
Represented By: Charles E. Raynal, IV
Represented By: Stephen Vincent Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips India Ltd.
Represented By: Jeffrey Phillips MacHarg
Represented By: Jonathan P. Heyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips North America LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Phillips MacHarg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V.
Represented By: Jeffrey Phillips MacHarg
Represented By: Jonathan P. Heyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koninklijke Philips N.V.
Represented By: Jeffrey Phillips MacHarg
Represented By: Jonathan P. Heyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: philips medical system technologies ltd.
Represented By: Jeffrey Phillips MacHarg
Represented By: Jonathan P. Heyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: philips medical systems (cleveland)
Represented By: Jeffrey Phillips MacHarg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips Medical Systems (Cleveland), Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Phillips MacHarg
Represented By: Jonathan P. Heyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips North America, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Phillips MacHarg
Represented By: Jonathan P. Heyl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?