Craft v. Tabor
Plaintiff: Joseph W. Craft, III
Defendant: Alexander Wellford Tabor
Case Number: 3:2019cv00469
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Alexander Wellford Tabor shall have up to and including December 23, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/14/19. (mga)
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Alexander Wellford Tabor. (Peralta, Paul). Motions referred to David Keesler.
October 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James Patrick McLoughlin, Jr on behalf of Alexander Wellford Tabor (McLoughlin, James)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Earl Shook on behalf of Alexander Wellford Tabor (Shook, Benjamin)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Javier Peralta on behalf of Alexander Wellford Tabor (Peralta, Paul)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Andrew Nebrig on behalf of Alexander Wellford Tabor (Nebrig, Mark)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph W. Craft, III. Alexander Wellford Tabor waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Adams, Michael)
September 30, 2019 Notice to J Kent Wicker: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 10/7/2019. (mga)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. J Kent Wicker is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiff Joseph W. Craft, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/30/19. (mga)
September 30, 2019 Notice to Kevin F. Hoskins: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 10/7/2019. (mga)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Kevin F. Hoskins is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiff Joseph W. Craft, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/30/19. (mga)
September 30, 2019 Notice to Katie Cassidy Tranter: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 10/7/2019. (mga)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Katie Cassidy Tranter is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Joseph W. Craft, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/30/19. (mga)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to J. Kent Wicker Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4200075. by Joseph W. Craft, III. (Adams, Michael). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kevin F. Hoskins Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4200073. by Joseph W. Craft, III. (Adams, Michael). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Katie Cassidy Tranter Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4199992. by Joseph W. Craft, III. (Adams, Michael). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Alexander Wellford Tabor. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brl)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Alexander Wellford Tabor. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brj)
September 20, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alexander Wellford Tabor with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4187202), filed by Joseph W. Craft, III. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - 2009 Signed Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 - 2010 Amendment, #4 Exhibit 3 - 2018 Letter from Craft to Tabor)(Adams, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craft v. Tabor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph W. Craft, III
Represented By: Michael G. Adams
Represented By: Nicholas Hayes Lee
Represented By: Kevin F. Hoskins
Represented By: Kathleen Cassidy Tranter
Represented By: J. Kent Wicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Wellford Tabor
Represented By: Benjamin Earl Shook
Represented By: Mark Andrew Nebrig
Represented By: Paul Javier Peralta
Represented By: James Patrick McLoughlin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?