Sparks et al v. Coloplast Corp.
Plaintiff: Jesse Sparks and Sheatina Sparks
Defendant: Coloplast Corp.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00475
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER denying without prejudice #93 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/8/19. (mga)
October 8, 2019 Filing 93 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sheatina Sparks. Responses due by 10/22/2019 (Love, Scott). Motions referred to David Keesler.
October 2, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Certain Counsel by Sheatina Sparks (Love, Scott)
October 1, 2019 Notice to W. Michael Moreland: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 10/8/2019. (tob)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #84 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added W. Michael Moreland for Sheatina Sparks. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/1/19. (tob)
October 1, 2019 Notice to Lana K. Varney: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 10/8/2019. (tob)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #85 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Lana K. Varney for Coloplast Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/1/19. (tob) Modified text on 10/8/2019 (rth).
October 1, 2019 Notice to Scott A. Love: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 10/8/2019. (tob)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #83 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Scott A. Love for Sheatina Sparks. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/1/19. (tob)
October 1, 2019 Notice to Kathryn Grace Hooten: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 10/8/2019. (tob)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #82 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Kathryn Grace Hooten for Sheatina Sparks . Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/1/19. (tob)
October 1, 2019 Notice to Adam Daniel Peavy: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 10/8/2019. (tob)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #81 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Adam Daniel Peavy for Sheatina Sparks. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/1/19. (tob)
October 1, 2019 Filing 86 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sheatina Sparks re #84 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to W. Michael Moreland Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4201148., #82 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kathryn Grace Hooten Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4201145., #83 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Scott A. Love Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4201147., #81 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Adam Daniel Peavy Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4201141. (Sasser, Charles)
October 1, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Lana K. Varney Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4201336. by Coloplast Corp.. (Henninger, Ursula). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2019: #1 Exhibit A) (ctb).
September 30, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to W. Michael Moreland Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4201148. by Sheatina Sparks. (Sasser, Charles). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 30, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Scott A. Love Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4201147. by Sheatina Sparks. (Sasser, Charles). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 30, 2019 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kathryn Grace Hooten Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4201145. by Sheatina Sparks. (Sasser, Charles). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 30, 2019 Filing 81 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Adam Daniel Peavy Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4201141. by Sheatina Sparks. (Sasser, Charles). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 30, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles McBrayer Sasser on behalf of Sheatina Sparks (Sasser, Charles)
September 30, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Ursula M. Henninger on behalf of Coloplast Corp. (Henninger, Ursula)
September 24, 2019 Notice to Laura J. Baughman, Lezzlie Elizabeth Hornsby, Scott A. Love, Shelley Van Natter Hutson, Sindhu S. Daniel, Anna Natalie Rol, Brittany Lauren Stewart Clark, Chizoba Onyeise, Clayton A. Clark, Kathryn Grace Hooten, William Michael Moreland, Lana K. Varney: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Associate local counsel and File a motion pro hac vice. Deadline by 10/1/2019. (rth)
September 24, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
September 24, 2019 Filing 78 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:14-cv-27484. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
September 23, 2019 Filing 77 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02387 - Coloplast Corp. (Attachments: #1 ECF 2551-1 - Exhibit A, #2 ECF 2551-2 - Exhibit B, #3 ECF 2553 - Minute Entry re Telephonic Hearing, #4 ECF 2554 - Order re Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, #5 ECF 2555 - Transcript 6-7-19 Telephonic Hearing, #6 ECF 2568 - Order re Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, #7 ECF 2581 - Plaintiffs Notice of Subpoena Diversified Plastics, #8 ECF 2600 - Plaintiffs Notice of Adoption (Becker), #9 ECF 2601 - Plaintiffs Notice of Adoption (Cole), #10 ECF 2603 - Plaintiffs Notice of Adoption (Freeman), #11 ECF 2605 - Plaintiffs Notice of Adoption (Molavi), #12 ECF 2608 - Coloplast Notice of Adoption (Kohli), #13 ECF 2609 - Coloplast Notice of Adoption (Mays), #14 ECF 2610 - Coloplast Notice of Adoption (Pence), #15 ECF 2611 - Coloplast Notice of Adoption (Rosenzweig), #16 ECF 2621 - Coloplast Notice of Adoption (Becker), #17 ECF 2622 - Coloplast Notice of Adoption (Cole), #18 ECF 2624 - Coloplast Notice of Adoption (Freeman), #19 ECF 2626 - Coloplast Notice of Adoption (Molavi), #20 ECF 2637 - Order re Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, #21 ECF 2638 - Order re Daubert Motions)(Varney, Lana) (Modified on 9/24/2019 to add party filer)(slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 76 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02387 - Coloplast Corp. (Attachments: #1 ECF 2535-1 - Exhibit 1, #2 ECF 2535-2 - Exhibit 2, #3 ECF 2535-3 - Exhibit 3, #4 ECF 2536 - Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion to Exclude Pence, #5 ECF 2536-1 - Exhibit A, #6 ECF 2536-2 - Exhibit B, #7 ECF 2536-3 - Exhibit C, #8 ECF 2536-4 - Exhibit D, #9 ECF 2536-5 - Exhibit E, #10 ECF 2536-6 - Exhibit F, #11 ECF 2537 - Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion to Exclude Rosenzweig, #12 ECF 2538 - Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion to Exclude Kohli, #13 ECF 2540 - Coloplast Reply ISO Motion to Exclude Pence, #14 ECF 2540-1 - Exhibit 1-A, #15 ECF 2540-2 - Exhibit 1-B, #16 ECF 2542 - Coloplast Reply ISO Motion to Exclude Kohli, #17 ECF 2543 - Plaintiffs Reply ISO Motion to Exclude Becker, #18 ECF 2544 - Coloplast Reply ISO Motion to Exclude Rosenzweig, #19 ECF 2545 - Plaintiffs Reply ISO Motion to Exclude Cole, #20 ECF 2546 - Plaintiffs Reply ISO Motion to Exclude Molavi, #21 ECF 2550 - Coloplast Reply ISO Motion to Exclude Mays, #22 ECF 2550-1 - Exhibit 1, #23 ECF 2550-2 - Exhibit 2, #24 ECF 2550-3 - Exhibit 3, #25 ECF 2550-4 - Exhibit 4)(Varney, Lana) (Modified on 9/24/2019 to add party filer)(slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 75 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02387 - Coloplast Corp. (Attachments: #1 ECF 2511 - Plaintiffs Memo ISO Motion to Exclude Molavi, #2 ECF 2512 - Coloplast Motion to Exclude Rosenzweig, #3 ECF 2513 - Coloplast Memo ISO Motion to Exclude Rosenzweig, #4 ECF 2514 - Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Freeman, #5 ECF 2514-1 - Exhibit 1, #6 ECF 2514-2 - Exhibit 2, #7 ECF 2520 - Plaintiffs Memo ISO Motion to Exclude Freeman, #8 ECF 2522 - Transcript 4-12-19 Telephonic Hearing, #9 ECF 2526 - Plaintiffs Certificate of Service, #10 ECF 2527 - Coloplast Opposition to Motion to Exclude Molavi, #11 ECF 2528 - Coloplast Opposition to Motion to Exclude Freeman, #12 ECF 2528-1 - Exhibit 1, #13 ECF 2528-2 - Exhibit 2, #14 ECF 2528-3 - Exhibit 3, #15 ECF 2528-4 - Exhibit 4, #16 ECF 2528-5 - Exhibit 5, #17 ECF 2528-6 - Exhibit 6, #18 ECF 2528-7 - Exhibit 7, #19 ECF 2529 - Coloplast Opposition to Motion to Exclude Becker, #20 ECF 2529-1 - Exhibit 1, #21 ECF 2529-2 - Exhibit 2, #22 ECF 2529-3 - Exhibit 3, #23 ECF 2529-4 - Exhibit 4, #24 ECF 2529-5 - Exhibit 5, #25 ECF 2529-6 - Exhibit 6, #26 ECF 2529-7 - Exhibit 7, #27 ECF 2529-8 - Exhibit 8, #28 ECF 2532 - Coloplast Opposition to Motion to Exclude Cole)(Varney, Lana) (Modified on 9/24/2019 to add party filer) (slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 74 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02387 - Coloplast Corp. (Attachments: #1 ECF 2500-1 - Exhibit 1, #2 ECF 2500-2 - Exhibit 2, #3 ECF 2500-3 - Exhibit 3, #4 ECF 2500-4 - Exhibit 4, #5 ECF 2500-5 - Exhibit 5, #6 ECF 2501 - Coloplast Memo ISO Motion to Exclude Pence, #7 ECF 2502 - Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Becker, #8 ECF 2502-1 - Exhibit 1, #9 ECF 2502-2 - Exhibit 2, #10 ECF 2503 - Plaintiffs Memo ISO Motion to Exclude Becker, #11 ECF 2504 - Coloplast Motion to Exclude Mays, #12 ECF 2504-1 - Exhibit 1, #13 ECF 2504-2 - Exhibit 2, #14 ECF 2504-3 - Exhibit 3, #15 ECF 2504-4 - Exhibit 4, #16 ECF 2504-5 - Exhibit 5, #17 ECF 2504-6 - Exhibit 6, #18 ECF 2504-7 - Exhibit 7, #19 ECF 2504-8 - Exhibit 8, #20 ECF 2504-9 - Exhibit 9, #21 ECF 2504-10 - Exhibit 9A, #22 ECF 2504-11 - Exhibit 10, #23 ECF 2505 - Coloplast Memo ISO Motion to Exclude Mays, #24 ECF 2508 - Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Cole, #25 ECF 2508-1 - Exhibit A, #26 ECF 2508-2 - Exhibit B, #27 ECF 2508-3 - Exhibit C, #28 ECF 2508-4 - Exhibit D, #29 ECF 2508-5 - Exhibit E, #30 ECF 2508-6 - Exhibit F, #31 ECF 2508-7 - Exhibit G, #32 ECF 2508-8 - Exhibit H, #33 ECF 2508-9 - Exhibit I, #34 ECF 2508-10 - Exhibit J, #35 ECF 2509 - Plaintiffs Memo ISO Motion to Exclude Cole)(Varney, Lana) (Modified on 9/24/2019 to add party filer) (slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 73 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02387 - Coloplast Corp. (Attachments: #1 ECF 2369 - Plaintiffs Reply to 2368 , #2 ECF 2370 - Plaintffs Reply to 2367 , #3 ECF 2377 - Minute Entry re Telephonic Hearing, #4 ECF 2379 - Coloplast Surreply to Motions to Compel, #5 ECF 2381 - Transcript 3-1-19 Telephonic Hearing, #6 ECF 2382 - Plaintiffs Motion re Letters Rogatory, #7 ECF 2383 - Plaintiffs Memo ISO Motion re Letters Rogatory, #8 ECF 2384 - Minute Entry re Hearing on Motion to Compel, #9 ECF 2388 - Plaintiffs Certificate of Service, #10 ECF 2393 - Pretrial Order 154, #11 ECF 2396 - Coloplast Opposition to Motion re Letters Rogatory, #12 ECF 2405 - Joint Motion to Seal, #13 ECF 2406 - Order re Motion to Seal, #14 ECF 2418 - Transcript 4-3-19 Telephonic Hearing, #15 ECF 2427 - Minute Entry re Telephonic Hearing, #16 ECF 2450 - Plaintiffs Hague Convention Request, #17 ECF 2453 - Plaintiffs Notice of Motion re Letters Rogatory, #18 ECF 2472 - Plaintiffs Hague Convention Request, #19 ECF 2483 - Order re Letters Rogatory, #20 ECF 2484 - Pretrial Order 158, #21 ECF 2496 - Coloplast Motion to Exclude Kohli, #22 ECF 2496-1 - Exhibit A, #23 ECF 2496-2 - Exhibit B, #24 ECF 2496-3 - Exhibit C, #25 ECF 2496-4 - Exhibit D, #26 ECF 2496-5 - Exhibit E, #27 ECF 2496-6 - Exhibit F, #28 ECF 2497 - Coloplast Memo ISO Motion to Exclude Kohli)(Varney, Lana) (Modified on 9/24/2019 to add party filer) (slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 72 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02387 - Coloplast Corp. (Attachments: #1 ECF 2260 - Pretrial Order 143, #2 ECF 2299 - Pretrial Order 145, #3 ECF 2310 - Pretrial Order 146, #4 ECF 2317 - Pretrial Order 147, #5 ECF 2338 - Pretrial Order 149, #6 ECF 2339 - Pretrial Order 150, #7 ECF 2346 - Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, #8 ECF 2347 - Plaintiffs Memo ISO Motion to Compel, #9 ECF 2348 - Plaintiffs Certification of Counsel, #10 ECF 2349 - Plaintiffs Motion to Shorten Time to Respond to 2346 , #11 ECF 2350 - Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, #12 ECF 2351 - Plaintiffs Motion to Shorten Time to Respond to 2350 , #13 ECF 2352 - Coloplast Opposition to 2349 , #14 ECF 2353 - Coloplast Opposition to 2351 , #15 ECF 2354 - Plaintiffs Reply ISO to 2352 , #16 ECF 2355 - Plaintiffs Reply to 2353 , #17 ECF 2359 - Order re Motions to Shorten Time, #18 ECF 2367 - Coloplast Opposition to Motion to Compel 2346 , #19 ECF 2367-1 - Varney Declaration, #20 ECF 2367-2 - Exhibit A, #21 ECF 2367-3 - Exhibit B, #22 ECF 2367-4 - Exhibit C, #23 ECF 2367-5 - Exhibit D, #24 ECF 2367-6 - Exhibit E, #25 ECF 2367-7 - Exhibit F, #26 ECF 2367-8 - Exhibit G, #27 ECF 2367-9 - Exhibit H)(Varney, Lana) (Modified on 9/24/2019 to add party filer)(slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 71 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02387 - Coloplast Corp. (Attachments: #1 ECF 634 - Pretrial Order 112, #2 ECF 969 - Pretrial Order 117, #3 ECF 1028 - Pretrial Order 119, #4 ECF 1197 - Pretrial Order 121, #5 ECF 1198 - Plaintiffs Second Amended LF Complaint, #6 ECF 1258 - Coloplast Answer to Plaintiffs Second Amended LF Complaint, #7 ECF 1259 - Pretrial Order 122, #8 ECF 1260 - Pretrial Order 123, #9 ECF 1261 - Pretrial Order 124, #10 ECF 1262 - Mentor Answer to Plaintiffs Second Amended LF Complaint, #11 ECF 1275 - Pretrial Order 125, #12 ECF 1276 - Pretrial Order 126, #13 ECF 1277 - Pretrial Order 127, #14 ECF 1289 - Pretrial Order 128, #15 ECF 1351 - Pretrial Order 129, #16 ECF 1361 - Pretrial Order 130, #17 ECF 1382 - Pretrial Order 131, #18 ECF 1430 - Pretrial Order 132, #19 ECF 1448 - Pretrial Order 134, #20 ECF 1489 - Plaintiffs Motion re Mentor OBTape MDL Production, #21 ECF 1490 - Plaintiffs Memo ISO 1489 , #22 ECF 1491 - Pretrial Order 135, #23 ECF 1508 - Order re 1489 , #24 ECF 1509 - Mentors Opposition to Order 1508 re 1489 ], #25 ECF 1543 - Order re 1489 , #26 ECF 1583 - Pretrial Order 136, #27 ECF 2142 - Pretrial Order 138, #28 ECF 2240 - Pretrial Order 139, #29 ECF 2241 - Pretrial Order 140)(Varney, Lana) (Modified on 9/24/2019 to add party filer) (slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 70 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02387 - Coloplast Corp. (Attachments: #1 ECF 13 - Pretrial Order 5, #2 ECF 33 - Pretrial Order 10, #3 ECF 40 - Pretrial Order 12, #4 ECF 41 - Pretrial Order 13, #5 ECF 48 - Pretrial Order 15, #6 ECF 59 - Pretrial Order 20, #7 ECF 86 - Joint Motion Show Cause Dismissal Certain Defendants, #8 ECF 87 - Pretrial Order 26, #9 ECF 89 - Pretrial Order 27, #10 ECF 92 - Pretrial Order 28, #11 ECF 93 - Pretrial Order 29, #12 ECF 96 - Pretrial Order 30, #13 ECF 124 - Pretrial Order 32, #14 ECF 256 - Pretrial Order 59, #15 ECF 374 - Pretrial Order 74, #16 ECF 381 - Pretrial Order 76, #17 ECF 389 - Pretrial Order 77, #18 ECF 395 - Pretrial Order 79, #19 ECF 420 - Pretrial Order 80, #20 ECF 442 - Pretrial Order 86, #21 ECF 474 - Pretrial Order 90, #22 ECF 491 - Pretrial Order 94, #23 ECF 508 - Pretrial Order 98, #24 ECF 527 - Pretrial Order 100, #25 ECF 558 - Pretrial Order 102, #26 ECF 561 - Pretrial Order 103, #27 ECF 562 - Pretrial Order 104, #28 ECF 572 - Pretrial Order 105, #29 ECF 588 - Pretrial Order 107, #30 ECF 621 - Pretrial Order 109)(Varney, Lana) (Modified on 9/24/2019 to add party filer)(slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 9/24/2019 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 9/23/2019 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/10/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2387; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mms) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #36 MOTION by Jesse Sparks and Sheatina Sparks to Withdraw Counsel Stephen T. Blackburn and Substitute Sindhu S. Daniel, Stephen T. Blackburn is withdrawn as counsel of record and Sindhu S. Daniel is substituted as counsel of record along with Laura J. Baughman in this member civil action. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/3/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 67 REPLY by Coloplast Corp. to #65 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Varney, Lana) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 66 REPLY by Coloplast Corp. to #64 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Varney, Lana) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 65 RESPONSE by Sheatina Sparks in opposition to #59 MOTION by Coloplast Corp. to Exclude or Limit Certain Opinions and Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 64 RESPONSE by Sheatina Sparks in opposition to #57 MOTION by Coloplast Corp. for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 63 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Sheatina Sparks (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 62 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Coloplast Corp. (Varney, Lana) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 PRETRIAL ORDER # 160 (ORDER AND SHOW CAUSE ORDER) Exhibit A Directing that the parties must identify each case as a Remand or Transfer Case and for the Transfer Cases on Exhibit A, the parties must identify venue information as follows: (1) the agreed venue or disputed venue; (2) plaintiff's counsel of record; (3) plaintiff's city and state of residence; and (4) state of plaintiff's implant and any removal(s). For the Remand Cases on Exhibit A, the parties must identify (1) the jurisdiction to which the case must be returned as indicated on the court's docket sheet; and (2) plaintiff's counsel. The parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the Transfer Cases and work to identify the remand jurisdiction for the Remand Cases as indicated on the court's docket sheet by 6/1/2019; directing that parties to file the above information by 6/13/2019. The submission of the information as directed by the court is essential to the planned remand or transfer of the remaining cases in this MDL. Exhibit B - Show Cause Directing that in each individual case on Exhibit B, plaintiffs and Coloplast, Inc. or Mentor Worldwide (where named) show cause on or before 6/17/2019, why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the court's scheduling orders pursuant to Rule 16(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Exhibit C - Show Cause Directing that before 6/17/2019, the plaintiff in each individual case must show cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/20/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2387; Cases Listed on Exhibits A, B and C) (hkl) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Coloplast Corp. in support of #59 MOTION by Coloplast Corp. to Exclude or Limit Certain Opinions and Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. (Varney, Lana) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION by Coloplast Corp. to Exclude or Limit Certain Opinions and Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Varney, Lana) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Coloplast Corp. in support of #57 MOTION by Coloplast Corp. for Partial Summary Judgment (Varney, Lana) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION by Coloplast Corp. for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Errata 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Varney, Lana) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PRETRIAL ORDER # 159 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases in Wave 5, 6, 7 and 8 are directed to show cause in writing in each individual case, why they should not be sanctioned pursuant to Rule 16(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failing to comply with my Order by Wednesday, 5/22/2019; the court has attached Exhibit A, which contains the remaining cases in Coloplast Waves 5, 6, 7 and 8; as a courtesy, the court has attached Exhibit B, containing the cases (1) in Coloplast Wave 9 and (2) other MDL waves now in the Coloplast MDL. The court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/7/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2387; Each case in Coloplast Waves 5, 6, 7 and 8) (mms) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 55 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Coloplast Corp. of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. on May 3, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. (Varney, Lana) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Lezzlie Elizabeth Hornsby on behalf of Sheatina Sparks. (Hornsby, Lezzlie) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
April 27, 2019 Filing 53 RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS by Sheatina Sparks to #50 Notices of Deposition of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. (Hooten, Kathryn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 52 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Coloplast Corp. of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. on April 29, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. (Varney, Lana) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Coloplast Corp. for Designation and Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. (Varney, Lana) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Coloplast Corp. of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. on April 29, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. (Varney, Lana) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Shelley Van Natter Hutson on behalf of Sheatina Sparks. (Hutson, Shelley) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 48 CROSS- NOTICE of Videotaped Deposition of Manish Patel, MD by Coloplast Corp. re: #47 Notice of Deposition (Varney, Lana) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 47 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Jesse Sparks, Sheatina Sparks of Manish Patel, M.D. on March 28, 2019 at 7:00 p.m. (Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Coloplast Corp. of Jesse Sparks on March 27, 2019 at 9:00 am (Varney, Lana) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Coloplast Corp. of Sheatina Sparks on March 27, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. (Varney, Lana) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PRETRIAL ORDER # 154 (Order re: Supplement to Coloplast Wave 5, 6, 7 and 8 Transfer and Remand Information) The court ORDERS that Pretrial Order #s 142 (Wave 5), 146 (Wave 6), 147 (Wave 7), and 150 (Wave 8) are AMENDED, but only as to paragraph C.1 and 2; all other provisions of each PTO listed above (including C.3) remain in place, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/13/2019. (cc: any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2387; Coloplast Wave 5-8 cases that remain open) (kab) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sheatina Sparks for Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Testimony Disclosures. (Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Sheatina Sparks of Zachery C. Baxter, M.D. on April 1, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Sheatina Sparks of Manish Patel, M.D. on April 1, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sheatina Sparks for Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Testimony Disclosures. (Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kathryn Grace Hooten on behalf of Sheatina Sparks. (Hooten, Kathryn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Scott A. Love on behalf of Sheatina Sparks. (Love, Scott) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Michael Moreland on behalf of Sheatina Sparks. (Moreland, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION by Jesse Sparks and Sheatina Sparks to Withdraw Counsel Stephen T. Blackburn and Substitute Sindhu S. Daniel (Daniel, Sindhu) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Coloplast Corp. for First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production. (Varney, Lana) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL FOR PLAINTIFF, JESSE SPARKS/ORDER Pursuant to FRCP41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Plaintiff Jesse Sparks only is dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/3/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 33 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL For Jessie Sparks Without Prejudice by Jesse Sparks, Sheatina Sparks, Coloplast Corp. (Baughman, Laura) (Modified on 12/4/2018 to add party filer) (lca). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Anna Natalie Rol on behalf of Jesse Sparks, Sheatina Sparks. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rol, Anna) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Chizoba Onyeise on behalf of Jesse Sparks, Sheatina Sparks. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Onyeise, Chizoba) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Brittany Lauren Stewart Clark on behalf of Jesse Sparks, Sheatina Sparks. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clark, Brittany) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Sindhu S. Daniel on behalf of Jesse Sparks, Sheatina Sparks. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Daniel, Sindhu) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
November 15, 2018 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sheatina Sparks for Certificate of Compliance With PTO #142. (Daniel, Sindhu) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
November 15, 2018 Filing 27 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Sheatina Sparks. (Daniel, Sindhu) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PRETRIAL ORDER # 143 (Order Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference for Certain Unresolved Cases December 4 and 5, 2018) Directing that 1.) For the cases identified on Exhibit A, attached hereto, the court will conduct a mandatory settlement conference in those cases beginning on 12/4/2018 at 9:00 a.m. 2.) For the cases identified on Exhibit B, attached hereto, the court will conduct a mandatory settlement conference in those cases beginning on 12/5/2018 at 9:00 a.m. 3.) For the cases identified on Exhibit C, attached hereto, these cases have been identified as resolved and pending dismissal by the parties; the parties in these cases need not attend this mandatory settlement conference, but must dismiss and close their cases by 1/11/2019, or an in person show cause hearing will be set. Further directing that (1) individual plaintiffs whose cases are scheduled for a settlement conference shall appear in person for the settlement conference with counsel of record as reflected on the docket sheet for that plaintiff's case; and (2) any plaintiff who fails to comply with this PTO may be subject to a substantial sanction, including dismissal with prejudice. Should any cases on the attached exhibit be closed before the settlement conference, attendance is not required in such case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2387; Cases Listed on Exhibits A-C) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PRETRIAL ORDER # 142 (Docket Control Order - Coloplast Wave 5 Cases) The cases on Exhibits A are: 1.) removed from the pending inactive docket; and 2.) placed on the active docket. As to the cases on Exhibits A and B: 1.) The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; 2.) To the extent other defendants, in addition to Coloplast, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; 3.) The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in the main MDL, every case listed on Exhibits A and B becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order; and 4.) The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 5 cases with one important exception. If any of the cases on any exhibit were previously on a docket control order and dispositive and Daubert deadlines had passed before such cases became inactive, the parties may not file or refile dispositive or Daubert motions without first seeking leave of court for good cause shown. A. SCHEDULING DEADLINES. The following deadlines shall apply in all Coloplast Wave 5 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 11/15/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due 11/22/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due 12/21/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due 02/22/2019; Expert disclosure served by defendants due 03/22/2019; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due 03/29/2019; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due 04/29/2019; Filing of dispositive motions due 05/13/2019; Response to dispositive motions due 05/27/2019; Reply to response to dispositive motions due 06/03/2019; Filing of Daubert motions due 05/13/2019; Responses to Daubert motions due 05/27/2019; Reply to response to Daubert motions due 06/03/2019. B. MOTION PRACTICE. 3.) Confidential Documents. Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 03/25/2019, and any response is due by 04/09/2019. Any reply is due by 04/15/2019. The court expects full compliance with Local Civil Rule 26.4(c). C. CASES READY FOR TRANSFER, REMAND OR TRIAL 1.) Venue Recommendations. By no later than 04/06/2019, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 04/13/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/31/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2387; Coloplast Wave 5 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PRETRIAL ORDER # 142 (Docket Control Order - Coloplast Wave 5 Cases) The cases on Exhibits A are: 1.) removed from the pending inactive docket; and 2.) placed on the active docket. As to the cases on Exhibits A and B: 1.) The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; 2.) To the extent other defendants, in addition to Coloplast, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; 3.) The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in the main MDL, every case listed on Exhibits A and B becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order; and 4.) The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 5 cases with one important exception. If any of the cases on any exhibit were previously on a docket control order and dispositive and Daubert deadlines had passed before such cases became inactive, the parties may not file or refile dispositive or Daubert motions without first seeking leave of court for good cause shown. A. SCHEDULING DEADLINES. The following deadlines shall apply in all Coloplast Wave 5 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 11/15/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due 11/22/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due 12/21/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due 02/22/2019; Expert disclosure served by defendants due 03/22/2019; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due 03/29/2019; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due 04/29/2019; Filing of dispositive motions due 05/13/2019; Response to dispositive motions due 05/27/2019; Reply to response to dispositive motions due 06/03/2019; Filing of Daubert motions due 05/13/2019; Responses to Daubert motions due 05/27/2019; Reply to response to Daubert motions due 06/03/2019. B. MOTION PRACTICE. 3.) Confidential Documents. Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 03/25/2019, and any response is due by 04/09/2019. Any reply is due by 04/15/2019. The court expects full compliance with Local Civil Rule 26.4(c). C. CASES READY FOR TRANSFER, REMAND OR TRIAL 1.) Venue Recommendations. By no later than 04/06/2019, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 04/13/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/31/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2387; Coloplast Wave 5 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRETRIAL ORDER # 140 (First Amended Order re: Scheduling Mandatory Settlement Conference for Certain Remaining Plaintiffs in Coloplast MDL) Directing that PTO # 139 is amended to change the contact information for Mr. Skeeter Salim contained in footnote 2; the remainder of PTO # 139 remains unchanged. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/21/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2387; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mms) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PRETRIAL ORDER # 139 (Order re: Scheduling Mandatory Settlement Conference for Certain Remaining Plaintiffs in Coloplast MDL) Directing that (1) counsel for all plaintiffs identified in the attached Exhibit A, who have claims against Coloplast meet and confer with King & Spalding, Tucker Ellis and/or Ledy Gurren Bass DAvanzo & Siff, LLP, settlement counsel for Coloplast, on or before 11/2/2018, as more fully set forth herein; (2) Ms. Beyea-Schroeder and King & Spalding are directed to provide a joint written report to the court via email on 11/7 2018, identifying which cases remaining on Exhibit A, if any, have not been resolved or dismissed; (3) on or shortly after 11/12/2018, the court will enter an order identifying the cases where a settlement conference will be conducted because the case was not resolved or dismissed; that order will identify on which of the following dates the parties in each case must appear for the settlement conference: 12/4/2018 and 12/5/2018 or such other date as set by the court; (4) individual plaintiffs whose cases are scheduled for a settlement conference shall appear in person for the settlement conference along with counsel of record; (5) any plaintiff who fails to comply with this PTO may be subject to a substantial sanction, including dismissal with prejudice; (6) cases not settled during the settlement conference will be dealt with by further order. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2387; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2387 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2387 and individual cases remain in effect. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2387; Cases on inactive docket) Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/16/2018. (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL Coloplast Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL Coloplast Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2387; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL Coloplast Inactive") (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 8/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2387 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2387 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2387; Cases on inactive docket) (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 3/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2387 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2387 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/19/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2387; Cases on inactive docket). (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER on Motion filed in MDL 2387: granting MOTION by Lana K. Varney for Change of Address in MDL 2387 and each individual member case in which she is associated. The court DIRECTS the Clerk to update the information, as set forth in the Motion, both on the main master docket, and for each individual member case in MDL 2387 with which Lana K. Varney is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/29/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Coloplast Corporation have reached a settlement with regard to Coloplast. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. Plaintiff(s) and Coloplast may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 10/31/2017; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 1371 in MDL Case No. 2387 Coloplast. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 VACATED PURSUANT TO THE # 1385 ORDER FILED IN MDL 2387 ON 6/12/2017: INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Coloplast Corporation have reached a settlement with regard to Coloplast. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. Plaintiff(s) and Coloplast may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 10/31/2017; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 1372 in MDL Case No. 2387 Coloplast. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/12/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp) (Modified on 6/12/2017 to note order has been vacated) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
June 9, 2017 Filing 14 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Jesse Sparks, Sheatina Sparks. (Baughman, Laura) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
June 2, 2017 Filing 13 NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Minute Order Suspending Rule 7.1(a) - Panel Rule 7.1(a), requiring notification to the Clerk of the Panel of potential tag-along actions, is hereby suspended in this litigation until further notice. (hkl) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRETRIAL ORDER # 130 (Order Staying Coloplast Wave 1, 2, 3 and 4 Cases - AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MENTOR OR BIOLOGICS ONLY) It is directed that all wave deadlines are STAYED in Waves 1, 2, 3 and 4, but only as to claims involving Mentor Worldwide LLC or the biologic products (Suspend-Tutoplast Processed Fascia Lata and/or the Axis-Tutoplast Processed Dermis); for all other claims against Coloplast Corp. or other defendants, the wave deadlines remain in place; the requirements of PTO # 129 (Filing of Plaintiff Profile Forms and Plaintiff Fact Sheets) remain in place for all cases in the Coloplast MDL. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/1/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys) (REF: MDL 2387; Coloplast Wave 1, 2, 3 and 4 cases) (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL ORDER # 125 (Fourth Amended Docket Control Order - Coloplast Wave 1 Cases; Third Amended Docket Control Order - Coloplast Wave 2 Cases) The court ORDERS that except for the Defendant Fact Sheet deadline, discovery in the Coloplast Wave 1 and 2 cases is STAYED until 5/30/2017. Aside from the Defendant Fact Sheet deadline, which shall remain the same, the court has extended the remaining deadlines by twenty-one (21) days. The court ORDERS that the following deadlines apply in the Coloplast Wave 1 and 2 cases: Scheduling Deadlines. The following deadlines shall apply in the Coloplast Wave 1 and 2 cases: Defendant Fact Sheets due by 6/02/2017, Deadline for written discovery requests by due 8/21/2017, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 8/04/2017, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 9/04/2017, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 9/19/2017, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/03/2017, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/23/2017, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 11/06/2017, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/13/2017, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/30/2017, Responses to Daubert motions due by 11/06/2017, Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/20/2017. Confidential Documents. A consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 9/06/2017, any response is due 9/20/2017 and any reply is due 9/27/2017. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 9/13/2017, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties shall submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/25/2017. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/10/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys) (REF: MDL 2387; Coloplast Wave 1 and 2 cases) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL ORDER # 122 (Third Amended Docket Control Order - Coloplast Wave 1 Cases; Second Amended Docket Control Order - Coloplast Wave 2 Cases) The Clerk is directed to remove the Coloplast Wave 1 or 2 marking from the open Coloplast Waves 1 and 2 cases listed on Exhibit A that involve a biologic product. As to the remaining open cases in Coloplast Wave 1 and 2, this MDL is now in its final phase with only a few hundred cases remaining. As a result, it is necessary to place the cases remaining in Coloplast Waves 1 and 2 on a scheduling order as set forth below. The court ORDERS that the following deadlines apply in the remaining Coloplast Wave 1 and 2 cases attached hereto as Exhibit B: Scheduling Deadlines. The following deadlines shall apply in the Coloplast Wave 1 and 2 cases: Defendant Fact Sheets due by 6/02/2017, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 7/31/2017, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 7/14/2017, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 8/14/2017, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 8/29/2017, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/12/2017, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/02/2017, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/16/2017, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/23/2017, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/09/2017, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/23/2017, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/30/2017. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: A consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/16/2017, any response is due 8/30/2017 and any reply is due 9/06/2017. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/23/2017, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties shall submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/05/2017. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/25/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys) (REF: MDL 2387; Cases Listed on Exhibits A and B) (hkl) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL ORDER # 112 (Order Amending PTO # 105 to correct email address) The PTO # 105 is amended to correct Mr. Mark Holbrook's email address, the remaining provisions of PTO # 105 remain in force and effect; and the PTO # 12 is amended to omit paragraphs 2.a, 3.a (first paragraph only) and 3.b. referring to bellwether cases and subgroups of bellwether cases, the remaining provisions in PTO # 12 related to Plaintiff Profile Forms, PFSs and DFSs remain in place, and the PFS and DFS are adopted for use in the Coloplast MDL wave and other cases, where applicable, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/23/2016. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys) (MDL 2387; Wave 1 Cases) (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER # 109 (Second Amended Docket Control Order Coloplast Wave 1 Cases) The PTO # 103 (First Amended Docket Control Order Coloplast Wave 1 Cases) is amended to stay all deadlines for Coloplast Wave 1 cases except the Plaintiff Fact Sheet deadline of 8/19/2016. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/12/2016. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2387; Wave 1 Cases) (jld) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL ORDER # 105 (Order re: Amending PTO # 12 and Adopting Plaintiff Fact Sheets and Defendant Fact Sheets) The PTO # 12 is amended to omit paragraphs 2.a, 3.a (first paragraph only) and 3.b. In light of the court's recent decision to enter wave orders in this MDL, those provisions referring to bellwether cases and subgroups of bellwether cases are no longer applicable. The remaining provisions in PTO # 12 related to Plaintiff Profile Forms, PFSs and DFSs remain in place. The PFS and DFS is adopted for use in the Coloplast MDL wave and other cases, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/21/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit B) (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2387 WAVE 1 Cases) (kll) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL ORDER # 103 (First Amended Docket Control Order Coloplast Wave 1 Cases) The PTO # 102 is amended to (1) add a Plaintiff Fact Sheet Deadline of 8/19/2016, and (2) correct minor typographical errors. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/10/2016. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys) (REF: MDL 2387; Wave 1 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL ORDER # 102 (Docket Control Order Coloplast Wave 1 Cases) The cases identified on Exhibit A will be known as the Coloplast Wave 1 cases; the stay of discovery contained in PTO # 100 is lifted as to the Coloplast Wave 1 cases, and the following deadlines shall apply: Defendant Fact Sheets due by 9/19/2016, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 10/24/2016, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 10/10/2016, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 11/07/2016, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 11/23/2016, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 12/07/2016, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 12/27/2016, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 1/10/2017, Reply to response to Dispositive Motions due by 1/17/2017, Filing of Daubert Motions due by 1/09/2017, Responses to Daubert Motions due by 1/23/2017, Reply to response to Daubert Motions due by 1/30/2017, Filing of Motions in Limine due by 3/06/2017, and Response to Motions in Limine due by 3/13/2017; in the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner on or before 11/07, any response is due 11/21, and any reply is due 11/28; the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for the trial of each of the cases no later than 10/02/2017, and the parties shall submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 10/14/2017; the Clerk is directed to file a copy of this order in 2:12-md-2387 and in the Coloplast Wave 1 cases identified in Exhibit A and to identify each case on Exhibit A as a Coloplast Wave 1 case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/9/2016. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys) (REF: MDL 2387; Wave 1 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
December 30, 2014 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Anne Grigg on November 7, 2014. Coloplast Corp. waiver mailed on 11/4/2014, answer due 1/5/2015. (Blackburn, Stephen) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
December 3, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Lana K. Varney on behalf of Coloplast Corp.. (Varney, Lana) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
November 3, 2014 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 60 (Order Rescheduling Status Conference - Coloplast ONLY) entered on 10/16/2014 in MDL 2387 to attorneys in member case. (kw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]
October 31, 2014 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3510062. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 9/24/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sparks et al v. Coloplast Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Sparks
Represented By: Brittany Lauren Stewart Clark
Represented By: Chizoba Onyeise
Represented By: Laura J. Baughman
Represented By: Anna Natalie Rol
Represented By: Sindhu S. Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheatina Sparks
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Brittany Lauren Stewart Clark
Represented By: Kathryn Grace Hooten
Represented By: Shelley Van Natter Hutson
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Chizoba Onyeise
Represented By: Laura J. Baughman
Represented By: Anna Natalie Rol
Represented By: William Michael Moreland
Represented By: Sindhu S. Daniel
Represented By: Lezzlie Elizabeth Hornsby
Represented By: Scott Anthony Love
Represented By: Charles McBrayer Sasser
Represented By: Adam Daniel Peavy
Represented By: Kathryn G. Hooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coloplast Corp.
Represented By: Lana K. Varney
Represented By: Lana Kay Varney
Represented By: Ursula M. Henninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?