Huddleson v. Driven Brands, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kesha Huddleson
Defendant: Driven Brands, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00505
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 12/4/2019. (brl)
November 14, 2019 Notice to Mia A. Conza: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov, and File a motion pro hac vice. Deadline by 11/21/2019. (mga)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mia A. Conza is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant Driven Brands, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/14/19. (mga)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David S. Shankman is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant Driven Brands, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/14/19. (mga)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mia A. Conza Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4260650. by Driven Brands, Inc.. (Tkach, David). Motions referred to David Keesler.
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David S. Shankman Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4260554. by Driven Brands, Inc.. (Tkach, David). Motions referred to David Keesler.
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Driven Brands, Inc..(Tkach, David)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Driven Brands, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (mek)
October 3, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (mek)
October 3, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(mek)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 Addendum by Kesha Huddleson. Addendum to #1 Complaint (Proposed Summons) (Kelly, Alexander)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Driven Brands, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4207203), filed by Kesha Huddleson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Right to Sue Notice, #2 Cover Sheet)(Kelly, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huddleson v. Driven Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Driven Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kesha Huddleson
Represented By: Alexander Carr Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?