Bingham v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Jerry L Bingham, III
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00562
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Stephen Buck Daniel (Daniel, Stephen)
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Starr on behalf of All Defendants (Starr, William)
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Paul Joseph Osowski on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated, Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated. (Osowski, Paul)
October 30, 2019 Notice to Stephen Daniel: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 11/6/2019. (tob)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Stephen Daniel for Jerry L Bingham, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/30/19. (tob)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen Daniel Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4239255. by Jerry L Bingham, III. (Kinsley, Brian). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Leighton Kinsley on behalf of Jerry L Bingham, III (Kinsley, Brian)
October 24, 2019 Notice to John A Dalimonte, Paul Lincoln Stoller: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Associate local counsel and File a motion pro hac vice. Deadline by 10/31/2019. (rth)
October 22, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Western District of North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Certified Docket, #2 Case Management Orders, #3 Daubert Orders, #4 Deposition Designation Orders, #5 Discovery and Privilege Orders, #6 Discovery Orders, #7 Master and Short Form Pleadings, #8 Miscellaneous Orders, #9 Motions in Limine Orders)(rth)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-04263. Original electronic file and docket sheet received. Modified on 10/23/2019 (rth).
October 22, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to Western District of North Carolina via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/23/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND ANDTRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/23/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-4263-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/23/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16253209 filed by Jerry L Bingham, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bingham v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry L Bingham, III
Represented By: John A Dalimonte
Represented By: Paul Lincoln Stoller
Represented By: Brian Leighton Kinsley
Represented By: Stephen Buck Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Paul Joseph Osowski
Represented By: William M. Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Paul Joseph Osowski
Represented By: William M. Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?