James v. Moyihan
Plaintiff: JoAnn James
Defendant: Brian Moyihan
Case Number: 3:2019cv00597
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by JoAnn James (Bernardini, Andrew) Modified on 12/12/2019 (ctb).
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Brian Moyihan. (Bernardini, Andrew) Modified text and docket relationship on 12/5/2019 (ctb).
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Brian Moyihan. Responses due by 12/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum ISO Prefiling Injunction)(Bernardini, Andrew)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Brian Moyihan. Responses due by 12/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum ISO Motion to Dismiss)(Bernardini, Andrew) Modified duplicate text on 12/5/2019 (ctb).
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew N. Bernardini on behalf of All Defendants (Bernardini, Andrew) Modified to delete attachments and Attorney notified to file as motions on 12/4/2019 (ctb).
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. The filing fee of $400.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Application or Fee due by 11/26/2019. (rys)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against Brian Moyihan, filed by JoAnn James. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rys)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Moyihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAnn James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Moyihan
Represented By: Andrew N. Bernardini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?