Davis v. CCRx of North Carolina, LLC
Plaintiff: Garry Michael Davis
Defendant: CCRx of North Carolina, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00604
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 5 days. Discovery due by 5/27/2020. Motions due by 6/24/2020. Mediation deadline set for 6/10/2020. Jury Trial set for 9/8/2020 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 12/10/19. (clc)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Packer, Leslie)
November 15, 2019 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 12/4/2019. (brl)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by CCRx of North Carolina, LLC.(Packer, Leslie)
November 7, 2019 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brj)
November 7, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CCRx of North Carolina, LLC (Packer, Leslie)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 19-CVS-18460. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4250559), filed by CCRx of North Carolina, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint filed in Mecklenburg County, #2 Exhibit Summons issued by Mecklenburg County)(Packer, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. CCRx of North Carolina, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCRx of North Carolina, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Ward Jackson
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garry Michael Davis
Represented By: James C. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?