Sagicor Life Insurance Company v. Houchins et al
Plaintiff: Sagicor Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Third Financial, Inc., Eugene E. Houchins, III and William I. Davis
Case Number: 3:2019mc00095
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION re #1 MOTION to Compel Nonparty Production of Documents and Deposition ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0419-4090557) filed by Sagicor Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Miller Life Insurance Application)(Sperati, John)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Compel Nonparty Production of Documents and Deposition ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0419-4090557) by Sagicor Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-emails from Sagicor to Miller regarding Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit B-emails between Sagicor and opposing counsel regarding document production, #3 Exhibit C-emails from Sagicor to Miller regarding deposition, #4 Exhibit D-letter from Miller to Sagicor regarding Motion to Compel)(Sperati, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 Letter/Notice from Russell Miller re Dismissal of case 5:17-cv-02189 in the Northern District of Alabama (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Envelope)(mga)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #1 MOTION to Compel Nonparty Production of Documents and Deposition by Russell Miller. Replies due by 8/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Envelope)(mga)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Mail ( #2 Order) addressed to Russell G Miller returned as undeliverable. (rys)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Mail ( #2 Order) addressed to Russell G. Miller returned as undeliverable. (ctb)
August 2, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1 MOTION to Compel Nonparty Production of Documents and Deposition. Responses due by 8/16/2019 (mga)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Defendants and Russell Miller may file responses re #1 MOTION to Compel Nonparty Production of Documents and Deposition on or before August 16, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/1/19. (mga)
July 29, 2019 Motion referred to David Keesler.: #1 MOTION to Compel Nonparty Production of Documents and Deposition ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0419-4090557) (eef)
July 10, 2019 NOTICE: Case was filed using the wrong event. Case has been copied from 3:19-cv-318 to 3:19-mc-95. Please use 3:19-mc-95 for all future pleadings. (eef)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel Nonparty Production of Documents and Deposition ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0419-4090557), filed by Sagicor Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Document Subpoena, #2 Exhibit B- March 5, 2019 letter, #3 Exhibit C- Deposition Subpoena, #4 Exhibit D- March 20, 2019 letter, #5 Exhibit E- April 22, 2019 letter, #6 Exhibit F- emails, #7 Exhibit G- Notice of Hearing, #8 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel, #9 Proposed Order)(Sperati, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sagicor Life Insurance Company v. Houchins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Third Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene E. Houchins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William I. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sagicor Life Insurance Company
Represented By: John M. Sperati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?