Ervin v. USA
Petitioner: James Scott Ervin, Jr.
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2020cv00009
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 3 Pro Se MOTION for Discovery Information by James Scott Ervin, Jr. Responses due by 2/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ams)
January 13, 2020 Filing 2 Pro Se Request for Documents by James Scott Ervin, Jr. Responses due by 1/27/2020 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ctb)
January 7, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 Pro Se MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) re: Criminal Case No. 3:16-cr-00233-MOC-DCK-1 ( USA2255Group added.), filed by James Scott Ervin, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Court of Appeals Cover Letter, #2 Cover Letters, #3 Envelope)(brj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ervin v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Scott Ervin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?