Patel v. Frazier et al
Plaintiff: Nayankumar Baratbhai Patel and Nayankumar Bharatbhai Patel
Defendant: Denise Frazier, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, William Barr and Chad Wolf
Case Number: 3:2020cv00012
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nayankumar Bharatbhai Patel (Bratton, Scott)
January 17, 2020 SECOND Notice to Scott Bratton: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 1/24/2020. (tmg)
January 9, 2020 Notice to Scott E. Bratton: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 1/16/2020. (mek)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Scott E. Bratton for Nayankumar Bharatbhai Patel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/9/2020. (mek)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nayankumar Baratbhai Patel (Lopez, Andres)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Scott Bratton Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4327968. by Nayankumar Baratbhai Patel. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Lopez, Andres). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(brj)
January 7, 2020 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brj)
January 7, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4326035), filed by Nayankumar Baratbhai Patel. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Pro Hac Vice Motion, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Summons, #6 Civil Summons, #7 Civil Summons, #8 Civil Summons, #9 Civil Summons, #10 Disclosure, #11 Exhibit, #12 Proposed Order)(Lopez, Andres)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel v. Frazier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nayankumar Baratbhai Patel
Represented By: Andres Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nayankumar Bharatbhai Patel
Represented By: Andres Lopez
Represented By: Scott Eric Bratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?