Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V. et al v. TEC Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips India Ltd. and Philips North America LLC
Defendant: TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. and Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler
Petitioner: Dale Dorow and William Griswold
Case Number: 3:2020cv00021
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 269 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 1/29/20 before Judge Cogburn. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Policy at www.ncwd.uscourts.gov Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2020. (Reporter: Cheryl Nuccio, 704-350-7494)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (MacHarg, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry: STATUS CONFERENCE held before District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. Plaintiffs attorney: Kirsten Rydstrom. Defendants attorney: Lora Brzezynski. Court reporter: Cheryl Nuccio. (ams)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/12/2020 as directed by Court on the record at the Status Conference. (ams)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Jeffrey Phillips MacHarg on behalf of Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC, Philips India Ltd., Attorney Dorothy Cornwell terminated. (MacHarg, Jeffrey)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 266 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Hayes Lee on behalf of Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler (Lee, Nicholas)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 265 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Harrison Mann Gates on behalf of Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., TEC Holdings, Inc., Attorney Scott Ernest Taylor; Henry R. Chalmers and Megan P. Mitchell terminated. (Gates, Harrison)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER granting #255 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Thatcher A. Rahmeier is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant Robert A. Wheeler. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/21/20. (mga)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting #254 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Lora A. Brzezynski is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant Robert A. Wheeler. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/21/20. (mga)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting #253 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David W. Higer is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant Robert A. Wheeler. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/21/20. (mga)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER granting #251 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Gregory D. Vose is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/17/20. (mga)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER granting #250 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Richard A. Graham, Jr. is hereby admitted pro hac vice to present Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/17/20. (mga)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER granting #249 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Gerard M. Donovan is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/17/20. (mga)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER granting #248 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Christopher R. Brennan is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/17/20. (mga)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER granting #247 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Douglas B. McKnight is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/17/20. (mga) Modified signature date on 1/21/2020 (mga).
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER granting #246 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Kirsten R. Rydstrom is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/17/20. (mga)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice to Christoopher R. Brennan: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 1/28/2020. (mga)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice to Douglas B. McKnight: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 1/28/2020. (mga)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Thatcher A. Rahmeier Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4348823. by Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler. (Raynal, Charles). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Lora A. Brzezynski Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4348821. by Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler. (Raynal, Charles). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David W. Higer Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4348818. by Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler. (Raynal, Charles). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Stephen Vincent Carey on behalf of Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler, Attorney John C. Amabile terminated. (Carey, Stephen)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Gregory D. Vose Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4348496. by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (MacHarg, Jeffrey). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Richard A. Graham, Jr. Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4348449. by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (MacHarg, Jeffrey). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Gerard M. Donovan Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4348445. by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (MacHarg, Jeffrey). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher R. Brennan Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4348439. by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (MacHarg, Jeffrey). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Douglas B. McKnight Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4348426. by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (MacHarg, Jeffrey). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kirsten R. Rydstrom Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4348408. by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (MacHarg, Jeffrey). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 245 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Phillips MacHarg on behalf of Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC (MacHarg, Jeffrey)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference to discuss consolidation of related cases set for 1/29/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ams)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice to John Amabile, Christopher Robert Brennan, Lora A. Brzezynski, Henry R. Chalmers, Dorothy Cornwell, Gerard M. Donovan, Richard A. Graham, Jr., David W. Higer, Douglas B. McKnight, Megan P. Mitchell, Thatcher A. Rahmeier, Kirsten R. Rydstrom, Scott Ernest Taylor, Gregory Vose: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Associate local counsel and File a motion pro hac vice. Deadline by 1/21/2020. (rth)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. Motions referred to David Keesler: #216 , #140 , #170 , #213 , #171 This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:17-cv-02864. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 243 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (jed) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 242 CLERK'S JUDGMENT as Plaintiff's motion to dismiss counterclaims. (jed)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting #208 Motion to Transfer Case. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this case to the WDNC of North Carolina and CLOSE this case. Defendant Wheelers #210 Motion to Stay Discovery pending resolution of his motion to transfer is DENIED AS MOOT. The Court will not address the remaining motions because the case is being transferred. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 1/10/2020. (jed) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Civil Case Terminated. (jed) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Case electronically transferred to District of USDC WDNC. (jed) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting #235 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 12/20/2019. (jed) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting #229 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 12/16/2019. (jed) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Submission of #229 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #228 Notice of Filing to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting #226 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 12/12/2019. (jed) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER granting #222 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 12/12/2019. (jed) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Submission of the #222 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #221 Notice of Filing to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (aaq) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Submission of the #226 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #225 Notice of Filing to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (aaq) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Submission of the #216 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses, and #213 MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses & Production of Documents to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (aaq) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 236 REPLY BRIEF re #208 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of North Carolinaby Robert A. ("Andy") Wheeler (Redacted) filed by Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert A ("Andy") Wheeler (redacted))(Amabile, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #234 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Under Seal)(Amabile, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Reply Brief In Support of #208 Motion to Transfer Venue by Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler (Attachments: #1 Brief Reply In Support of Motion to Transfer Venue (unredacted), #2 Affidavit Declaration of Robert A. ("Andy") Wheeler (unredacted))(Amabile, John) Modified on 12/5/2019 to edit text (jed). Modified on 12/23/2019 to edit text(jed). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Submission of the #210 MOTION to Stay Discovery, and #208 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of North Carolinaby Robert A. ("Andy") Wheeler to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (aaq) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 NOTICE by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC re #171 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order, #172 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, of Supplemental Evidence (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 REPLY to Response to Motion re #210 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler. (Raynal, Charles) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 231 RESPONSE in Support re #229 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #228 Notice of Filing, filed by TEC Holdings, Inc., TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defs' 1st Supp Discovery Responses - REDACTED)(Kivus, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 230 RESPONSE in Support re #222 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #221 Notice of Filing, filed by TEC Holdings, Inc., TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Kivus, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #228 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 228 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Provisionally Sealed Documents by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC re #227 Response in Opposition to Motion,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit F (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit G (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit K (Filed Under Seal))(Cornwell, Dorothy) Modified on 12/16/2019 to edit text (jed). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 227 RESPONSE in Opposition re #213 MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses & Production of Documents filed by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit G (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K (Filed Under Seal), #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #225 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by TEC Holdings, Inc., TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal)(Kivus, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 225 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Exhibit B to Brief IOT Motion to Compel by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. re #224 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Zimmerman Dep Excerpts - FILED UNDER SEAL)(Kivus, John) Modified on 12/13/2019 to edit docket text (jed). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 224 RESPONSE in Opposition re #216 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by TEC Holdings, Inc., TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- 11-14-18 Letter to Opposing Counsel re deficiencies in doc production, #2 Exhibit B - Zimmerman Depo Excerpts REDACTED)(Kivus, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 RESPONSE in Opposition re #210 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #221 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Provisionally Sealed Documents by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC re #220 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Brief Unredacted version of DE 220, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Cornwell, Dorothy) Modified on 12/13/2019 to edit text (jed). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 RESPONSE in Opposition re #208 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of North Carolinaby Robert A. ("Andy") Wheeler filed by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit B (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit C (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit D (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit E)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS TEC Holdings Inc. and Transtate Equipment Company Inc.s Motion for Leave to File Under Seal [ECF 215] and Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Under Seal [ECF 218]. The Clerk is DIRECTED to seal ECF 214 and ECF 217. (ccs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #217 Notice of Filing,, with Brief In Support by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Provisionally Sealed Documents by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC re #216 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit M, #13 Exhibit N, #14 Exhibit O, #15 Exhibit W, #16 Exhibit X, #17 Exhibit Y, #18 Exhibit Z, #19 Exhibit AA, #20 Exhibit AB, #21 Exhibit AF, #22 Exhibit AG, #23 Exhibit AH, #24 Exhibit AJ, #25 Exhibit AK)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses with Brief In Support by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit AB, #30 Exhibit AC, #31 Exhibit AD, #32 Exhibit AE, #33 Exhibit AF, #34 Exhibit AG, #35 Exhibit AH, #36 Exhibit AI, #37 Exhibit AJ, #38 Exhibit AK, #39 Exhibit AL)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #214 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by TEC Holdings, Inc., TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal)(Kivus, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Exhibit to Motion to Compel by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. re #213 MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses & Production of Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex B - FILED UNDER SEAL)(Kivus, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses & Production of Documents with Brief In Support by TEC Holdings, Inc., TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief In Support of Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit Ex A - Letters re discovery deficiencies, #3 Exhibit Ex B Slip Sheet - Exhibit To Be Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit Ex C - Specific Transtate RFPs re which the MTC is filed, #5 Exhibit Ex D - Specific TEC RFPs re which the MTC if filed)(Kivus, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER - This matter is before the Court on Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extensions of Time [ECF #209 ]. For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion. Plaintiff shall have through November 13, 2019 to file a response to Defendant Wheeler's Motion to Transfer Venue [ECF #208 ]. Defendants shall have through December 4, 2019 to file a reply brief. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/1/2019. (tcc) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 211 TRANSCRIPT of the Teleconference Hearing Proceedings held on October 21, 2019, before Judge Steven D. Grimberg. Court Reporter/Transcriber Alicia B. Bagley. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/22/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MOTION to Stay Discovery with Brief In Support by Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit A - Dorow Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Transtate Equipment Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Zimmerman Complaint)(Amabile, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Respond re: #208 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of North Carolinaby Robert A. ("Andy") Wheeler by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MOTION to Transfer Case to Western District of North Carolinaby Robert A. ("Andy") Wheeler with Brief In Support by Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Defendant Robert A. ("Andy") Wheeler's Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Exhibit Complaint in Philips North America v. Dorow et al., #3 Exhibit Complaint in Philips Medical Systems et al. v. TEC Holdings, Inc. et al., #4 Exhibit Complaint in Philips North America LLC et al. v. Zimmerman, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Robert A. ("Andy") Wheeler)(Amabile, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER granting #194 Application for Admission of Richard A. Graham, Jr. Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/23/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tcc) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Richard A. Graham, Jr. re #207 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (tcc) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steven D. Grimberg:Telephone Conference held on 10/21/2019. The Court hosted the Conference for the parties to discuss ongoing discovery disputes. After hearing from the parties, the Court directs all parties to file new motions to compel to the extent that a partys pending motion to compel does not cover all discovery requests. The Court recommends that the parties try to confer regarding outstanding discovery requests, however, parties are ordered to file new motions to compel within 14 days of this entry. Any responsive pleadings must be filed within 14 days after the motion to compel is filed. Reply briefs are not permitted absent a request and Court order. The Court will endeavor to rule on the pending motion to dismiss within 30 days of this entry. As there has been no motion to stay discovery pending the disposition of Defendants motion to dismiss, discovery is ongoing, and all parties are directed to continue as such. Fact discovery will close on February 28, 2020. Absent a substantial showing of need, the Court will not extend fact discovery. The Court will enter a scheduling order providing additional deadlines for discovery at a future date. Per counsels statement that the parties may be open to mediation discussions, the Court directs counsel to discuss potential mediation with their clients. Plaintiffs counsel is instructed to e-mail a proposal for mediation to Chambers (Kristina_jones@gand.uscourts.gov) by close of business day on Friday, October 25, 2019. The proposal will state the following: (1) whether all parties agree to proceed in mediation discussions; (2) whether the parties wish to utilize the mediation services provided by the Court through a magistrate judge or to hire a private mediator; (3) whether counsel wishes to proceed with mediation discussions prior to the Courts ruling on Defendants motion to dismiss. The proposal will also contain a brief summary of any disagreement regarding those three topics. (Court Reporter Alicia Bagley)(ccs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons, #15 Certificate of Interested Persons, #168 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed and approved by SDG (kmj) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 205 NOTICE Of Filing Certificates of Compliance by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Compliance (Graham), #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Compliance (McKnight), #3 Exhibit 3 - Certificate of Compliance (Brennan), #4 Exhibit 4 - Certficate of Compliance (Donovan), #5 Exhibit 5 - Certificate of Compliance (Vose), #6 Exhibit 6 - Certificate of Compliance (Rydstrom), #7 Exhibit 7 - Certificate of Compliance (Cornwell))(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Chalmers, Henry) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Taylor, Scott) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Mitchell, Megan) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 NOTICE Of Filing by Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler Certificate of Compliance (Amabile, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 NOTICE Of Filing by Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler Certificate of Compliance (Amabile, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Amabile, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE Of Filing by Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler Certificate of Compliance (Amabile, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 NOTICE Of Filing by Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler Certificate of Compliance (Amabile, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Compliance by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. (Kivus, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Compliance by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. (Jackson, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #194 APPLICATION for Admission of Richard A. Graham, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8967348). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Richard A. Graham, Jr. added appearing on behalf of Philips India Ltd., Philips India Ltd., Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC, Philips North America LLC, Philips North America LLC (pmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 APPLICATION for Admission of Richard A. Graham, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8967348). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/26/19. (jpa) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Submission of #164 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #171 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order, #140 MOTION to Compel Dorow and Griswold Depositions , #170 MOTION to Compel Compliance with May 15 Discovery Order and Discovery Requests , #167 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, to District District Judge Steven D Grimberg. (ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to District Judge Steven D Grimberg. Judge J. P. Boulee no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:17-cv-2864-SDG. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting #190 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/23/19. (ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Submission of #170 MOTION to Compel Compliance with May 15 Discovery Order and Discovery Requests , to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/22/19. (bnw) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #189 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Provisionally Sealed Documents by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC re #188 Reply Brief, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13, #2 Exhibit 14)(Cornwell, Dorothy) Modified on 8/26/2019 to remove the word Provisionally from the entry (ddm). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 REPLY BRIEF re #170 MOTION to Compel Compliance with May 15 Discovery Order and Discovery Requests filed by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12 - July 26, 2019 Email, #2 Exhibit 13 - Provisionally Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 14 - Provisionally Filed Under Seal)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 REPLY BRIEF re #167 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler. (Amabile, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Submission of #167 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting #183 Application for Admission of Thatcher A. Rahmeier Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/14/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step. (sap) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting #182 Application for Admission of Lora A. Brzezynski Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/14/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step. (sap) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #182 APPLICATION for Admission of Lora A. Brzezynski Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Lora A. Brzezynski added appearing on behalf of TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler (pmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #183 APPLICATION for Admission of Thatcher A. Rahmeier Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Thatcher A. Rahmeier added appearing on behalf of TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler (pmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Submission of #171 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Non-Parties or, in the alternative, MOTION for Protective Order, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting #180 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by David W. Higer. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/9/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 APPLICATION for Admission of Thatcher A. Rahmeier Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler. (Amabile, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 APPLICATION for Admission of Lora A. Brzezynski Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler. (Amabile, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order RETURN of #178 APPLICATION for Admission of Thatcher A. Rahmeier Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8845417). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: courts. (pmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #180 APPLICATION for Admission of David W. Higer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8845505). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney David W. Higer added appearing on behalf of Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler (pmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order RETURN of #179 APPLICATION for Admission of Lora A. Brzezynski Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8845489). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: courts. (pmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 RESPONSE in Opposition re #170 MOTION to Compel Compliance with May 15 Discovery Order and Discovery Requests filed by TEC Holdings, Inc., TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Transcript of Telephonic Hearing, #2 Exhibit Ex B 7-26-19 Email re Forensic Insp. Protocol, #3 Exhibit Ex C Email Chain ending 6-26-19 re Forensic Insp. Protocol, #4 Exhibit Ex D 7-25-19 Letter transmitting hard drive, #5 Exhibit Ex E Declaration of AWheeler)(Jackson, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 APPLICATION for Admission of David W. Higer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8845505). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler. (Amabile, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 APPLICATION for Admission of Lora A. Brzezynski Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8845489). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler. (Amabile, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 APPLICATION for Admission of Thatcher A. Rahmeier Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8845417). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler. (Amabile, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 RESPONSE in Opposition re #167 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 DECLARATION of Lora A. Brzezynski re #171 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Non-Parties or, in the alternative, MOTION for Protective Order filed by Dale Dorow, William Griswold. (filed per 7/25/19 Order of Judge Vineyard in 1:19-mi-114-JPB.) (ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MEMORANDUM in Support of #171 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Non-Parties or, in the alternative, MOTION for Protective Order filed by Dale Dorow, William Griswold. (filed per 7/25/19 Order of Judge Vineyard in 1:19-mi-114-JPB.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena to Dale Dorow, #2 Exhibit 2 - Subpoena to William Griswold, #3 Exhibit 3 - May 10, 2019 Letter of Counsel to Hon. Leigh Martin May)(ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Submission of #164 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, to District Judge Jean-Paul Boulee. (ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 REPLY to Response to Motion re #164 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by TEC Holdings, Inc., TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Jackson, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 REPLY BRIEF in Support of #171 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Non-Parties or, in the alternative, MOTION for Protective Order filed by Dale Dorow, William Griswold. (filed per 7/25/19 Order of Judge Vineyard in 1:19-mi-114-JPB.) (ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 RESPONSE in Opposition to #171 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Non-Parties or, in the alternative, MOTION for Protective Order filed by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (filed per 7/25/19 Order of Judge Vineyard in 1:19-mi-114-JPB.) (Attachments: #1 Rydstrom Declaration, #2 Index of Exhibits to Rydstrom Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1: Initial Disclosures - Georgia Action, #4 Exhibit 2: TEC Discovery Responses, #5 Exhibit 3: Transtate Discovery Responses, #6 Exhibit 4: Feb 26 2019 Kivus Email, #7 Exhibit 5: Apr 4 2019 Jackson Email, #8 Exhibit 6: Dorow Notice, #9 Exhibit 7: Griswold Notice, #10 Exhibit 8: Apr 23 2019 Brzezynski Letter, #11 Exhibit 9: Apr 2019 Rydstrom and Brzezynski Emails, #12 Exhibit 10: May 15 2019 Discovery Conference Transcript)(ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Non-Parties or, in the alternative, MOTION for Protective Order filed by Dale Dorow, William Griswold. (filed per 7/25/19 Order of Judge Vineyard in 1:19-mi-114-JPB.) (ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MOTION to Compel Compliance with May 15 Discovery Order and Discovery Requests with Brief In Support by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 - May 23 Email, #3 Exhibit 2 - May 24 Email, #4 Exhibit 3 - May 30 Email, #5 Exhibit 4 - June 14 Letter, #6 Exhibit 5 - June 21 Email, #7 Exhibit 6 - April 22 Letter, #8 Exhibit 7 - Defendants' Responses to Interrogatories, #9 Exhibit 8 - Transtate's Responses to 3rd RFPs, #10 Exhibit 9 - TEC's Responses to 3rd RFPs, #11 Exhibit 10 - April 12 Letter, #12 Exhibit 11 - Specific Requests and Objections at Issue, #13 Affidavit of Gerard Donovan, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #142 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge Jean-Paul Boulee on 7/23/19. (ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Certificate of Interested Persons by Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler. (Amabile, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Brief In Support by Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Brief The Wheeler Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint)(Amabile, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 RESPONSE in Opposition re #164 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Responses by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc..(Kivus, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by TEC Holdings, Inc., TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' 2nd Am. Complaint (DE 139))(Jackson, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #155 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge Jean-Paul Boulee on 6/25/19. (ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting #146 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. Signed by Judge Jean-Paul Boulee on 6/25/19. (ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Submission of #155 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #154 Notice of Filing, , to District Judge Jean-Paul Boulee. (ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Jean-Paul Boulee. Judge Leigh Martin May no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:17-cv-2864-JPB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (adg) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Submission of #146 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #145 Notice of Filing, , #142 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #141 Notice of Filing,,, , #140 MOTION to Compel Dorow and Griswold Depositions , to District Judge Jean-Paul Boulee. (adg) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Submission of #140 MOTION to Compel Dorow and Griswold Depositions , #142 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #141 Notice of Filing, #146 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #145 Notice of Filing, , to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (adg) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting #160 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler Answer due 7/19/2019. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/14/2019. (tmf) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #139 Amended Complaint,, by Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Amabile, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E. Raynal, IV on behalf of Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler (Raynal, Charles) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Amabile on behalf of Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler (Amabile, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 RESPONSE in Support re #155 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #154 Notice of Filing, filed by TEC Holdings, Inc., TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Jackson, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 RESPONSE in Support re #142 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #141 Notice of Filing,,, filed by TEC Holdings, Inc., TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Jackson, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #154 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Provisionally Sealed Documents by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC re #153 Reply Brief to #140 Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N - to Reply In Support of Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit O - to Reply in Support of Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibit P - to Reply in Support of Motion to Compel)(Cornwell, Dorothy) Modified on 6/4/2019 to add hyperlink(tmf). Modified on 6/25/2019 to remove the word Provisionally from the entry (ddm). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 REPLY BRIEF re #140 MOTION to Compel Dorow and Griswold Depositions filed by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit O - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit P - Filed Under Seal)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Return of Service Executed by Philips North America LLC, Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V.. Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler in his capacity as personal representative and As executor of the estate of Daniel Wheeler served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Cornwell, Dorothy) Modified on 6/4/2019 to edit text(tmf). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Return of Service Executed by Philips North America LLC, Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V.. Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Cornwell, Dorothy) Modified on 6/4/2019 to edit event text (tmf). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting #147 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, TEC Holdings, Inc. and Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. Answer due 6/27/2019. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/3/2019. (tmf) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 RESPONSE in Opposition re #147 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #139 Amended Complaint,, filed by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 1. Defendant TEC Holding, INC.s Responses To Plaintiffs Third Set of Interrogatories, 2. Defendant Transtate Equipment Company, INC.s Responses To Plaintiffs Third Set of Interrogatories, 3. Defendant TEC Holding, INC.s Responses To Plaintiffs Fourth Set of Requests for Production of Documents, 4. Defendant Transtate Equipment Company, INC.s Responses To Plaintiffs Fourth Set of Requests for Production of Documents by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc..(Jackson, John) Modified on 6/3/2019 to edit text(tmf). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #139 Amended Complaint, by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order granting Extension to Respond to 2nd Amended Complaint)(Jackson, John) Modified on 6/3/2019 to edit text(tmf). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #145 Notice of Filing, with Brief In Support by TEC Holdings, Inc., TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief In Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order granting Motion for Leave to File Under Seal)(Jackson, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Response to Motion to Compel by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. re #140 MOTION to Compel Dorow and Griswold Depositions (Attachments: #1 Brief Response In Opposition to Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit Ex A to Response Brief)(Jackson, John) Modified on 6/25/2019 to remove the word Provisionally from the entry (ddm). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 RESPONSE in Opposition re #140 MOTION to Compel Dorow and Griswold Depositions filed by TEC Holdings, Inc., TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Declaration of R. Wheeler)(Jackson, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Electronic Summons Issued as to Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Summons Robert A. Wheeler, Executor)(tmf) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #141 Notice of Filing,,, with Brief In Support by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Provisionally Sealed Documents by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC re #140 MOTION to Compel Dorow and Griswold Depositions (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Griswold and Dorow Depositions, #2 Exhibit A to Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibit B to Motion to Compel, #4 Exhibit C to Motion to Compel, #5 Exhibit E to Motion to Compel, #6 Exhibit F to Motion to Compel, #7 Exhibit G to Motion to Compel, #8 Exhibit I to Motion to Compel, #9 Exhibit J to Motion to Compel, #10 Exhibit K to Motion to Compel, #11 Exhibit L to Motion to Compel)(Cornwell, Dorothy) Modified on 7/23/2019 to remove the word Provisionally from the entry (ddm). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MOTION to Compel Dorow and Griswold Depositions with Brief In Support by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Redacted, #2 Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit B - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit C - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit D - Email, #6 Exhibit E - Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit F - Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit G - Filed Under Seal, #9 Exhibit H - Letter, #10 Exhibit I - Filed Under Seal, #11 Exhibit J - Filed Under Seal, #12 Exhibit K - Filed Under Seal, #13 Exhibit L - Filed Under Seal, #14 Exhibit M - Motion to Quash, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court grants Defendants' opposed request for a 30 day extension of time to respond to the discovery requests at issue in their May 23, 2019 email. The Court will be very reluctant to grant future extensions as to this discovery. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 05/24/2019. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Philips North America LLC, Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Registration, #2 Summons to Robert A. Wheeler in his capacity as executor and personal representative of the Estate of Daniel Wheeler, #3 Summons to Robert A. Wheeler)(Cornwell, Dorothy) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference Proceedings held on 5/15/2019, before Judge Leigh Martin May. Court Reporter Montrell Vann, Telephone number 404-215-1549. Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter at Montrell_Vann@gand.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/11/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/21/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing of Transcript) (mv) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE Of Filing by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC Amended Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER GRANTING #112 , #121 Motions for Relief from Protective Order. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 5/20/2019. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' #99 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court does, however, CLARIFY that Plaintiffs' trade secret claims premised upon its PSMs are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint #105 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs are granted leave to amend to add Andy Wheeler and Daniel Wheeler (through the executor(s) of his estate) as parties, to allege new facts, and to assert additional claims except for the unfair competition claims. Moreover, with respect to Plaintiffs' additional claims for violations of the DTSA and the GTSA, Plaintiffs are granted leave to amend only to the extent that such claims are not premised upon PSMs. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file a Second Amended Complaint consistent with this Order within seven (7) days of the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 5/20/2019. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE Of Filing Subpeonas and Proofs of Service by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to Testify in a Civil Action to William Griswold, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service of Subpoena on William Griswold, #3 Exhibit Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action to Dale Dorow, #4 Exhibit Proof of Service of Subpeona on Dale Dorow)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiffs First Amended and Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendant Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.s First Set of Interrogatories by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC.(Cornwell, Dorothy) Modified on 5/20/2019 to edit text (tmf). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 RESPONSE re #131 Response (Non-Motion), Defendants' Discovery Dispute Briefing filed by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Defs' Memo on Current Discovery Disputes, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - Transtate First Set of RFPs REDACTED, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Defs' Response to Pltfs' Discovery Dispute Brief)(Mitchell, Megan) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 RESPONSE re #129 Telephone Conference filed by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 RESPONSE re #129 Telephone Conference, PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY DISPUTE BRIEF filed by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leigh Martin May: Telephone Conference held on 5/15/2019 to discuss Plaintiffs' and Defendants' discovery disputes. Plaintiffs will file a motion that deals with whether Dale Dorow and William Griswold are subject to depositions as managing agents. Dorow and Griswold and Defendants shall have 5 days thereafter to respond to the motion. The motion and the response shall be limited to 10 pages for each. The Court awarded Plaintiffs their costs for the untimely cancelled depositions of Dale Dorow and William Griswold. The Court denied Plaintiffs' request for attorneys fees as to the cancelled depositions. Plaintiffs shall provide the cost information to Defendants within 14 days. Plaintiffs' requested financial information issue including CT was put on hold until after the Court rules on the parties' pending motions. Within 14 days, Defendants shall provide Plaintiffs with any past and current technical event logs that have not already been produced. Defendants are allowed to use their own people to create the forensic images. Plaintiffs shall narrow their request for documents relating to due diligence to former efforts by Defendants to sell their business or assets. The Court will require Defendants to produce items related to a narrowed request. Defendants' request to compel production of documents from Plaintiffs was not ripe as the parties had not finished conferring on the issues. Defendants' request for a protective order preventing discovery on claims that have been dismissed or that are not otherwise pending is denied as the request is not sufficiently concrete. The parties were directed to confer and file an amended scheduling order with the pretrial deadlines within 14 days after the Court rules on the parties' pending motions. If the parties are unable to agree on the deadlines, they should email their separate proposals along with what they were able to agree on to Ms. Bachelor. The parties were directed to file their discovery dispute briefs and attachments on CM/ECF. (Court Reporter Montrell Vann)(btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER GRANTING #107 , 122 Motions for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. The Clerk is DIRECTED to seal the entirety of Dkt No. #106 and 122 . Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 5/14/2019. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Submission of #121 MOTION for Relief from #63 Order on Motion for Protective Order to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 REPLY BRIEF re #121 MOTION for Relief from #63 Order on Motion for Protective Order filed by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of discovery with Plaintiff's: 1)fourth set of requests for production of documents to TEC Holdings, Inc; 2)fourth set of requests for production of documents to Transtate Equipment Company, Inc; 3)third set of interrogatories to TEC Holdings, Inc; 4)third set of interrogatories to Transtate Equipment Company, Inc; 5)first set of requests for admission to TEC Holdings, Inc; 6)first set of requests for admission to TEC Holdings, Inc; 7)first Set of authentication requests for admission to defendant TEC Holdings, Inc; 8)first Set of authentication requests for admission to defendant TEC Holdings, Inc. filed by Philips India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC (Cornwell, Dorothy) Modified on 5/6/2019 to add discovery text(tmf). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Submission of 122 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #121 MOTION for Relief from #63 Order on Motion for Protective Order to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 RESPONSE in Support re 122 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #121 MOTION for Relief from #63 Order on Motion for Protective Order filed by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. (Jackson, John) Modified on 4/23/2019 to edit text. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 RESPONSE in Opposition re #121 MOTION for Relief from #63 Order on Motion for Protective Order filed by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. (Jackson, John) Modified on 4/23/2019 to edit text. (cmd) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER GRANTING #120 Motion to Correct Party Name. The Clerk is DIRECTED to modify the caption of this case to reflect that Philips Electronics India Ltd. changed its name to Philips India Ltd. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/9/2019. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION for Relief from #63 Order on Motion for Protective Order with Brief In Support by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Redacted, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C-filed under seal, #5 Exhibit D - filed under seal, #6 Exhibit E - filed under seal, #7 Exhibit F - filed under seal)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION to Substitute Party to Correct Party Name to Philips India Ltd. with Brief In Support by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Correct Party Name)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Submission of #112 MOTION for Relief from #63 Order on Motion for Protective Order , #105 MOTION to Amend #20 Amended Complaint, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 REPLY BRIEF re #105 MOTION to Amend #20 Amended Complaint, filed by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 REPLY to Response to Motion re #112 MOTION for Relief from #63 Order on Motion for Protective Order filed by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Submission of #107 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #106 Notice of Filing , #99 MOTION for Reconsideration re #92 Order to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibits re #116 Response in Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - TEC's Initial Disclosures, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit 3 - TEC's First Amended Initial Disclosures, #4 Exhibit 4 - Transtate's Responses to Philips First Set of Interrogatories)(Taylor, Scott) Modified on 3/15/2019 to remove double wording (btql). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 RESPONSE in Opposition re #105 MOTION to Amend #20 Amended Complaint, filed by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Taylor, Scott) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 REPLY BRIEF re #99 MOTION for Reconsideration re #92 Order on Motion to Strike,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,,,, Order on Motion to Stay,,, filed by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 RESPONSE in Opposition re #112 MOTION for Relief from #63 Order on Motion for Protective Order filed by TEC Holdings, Inc., TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Arconic Memo of Law excerpt)(Jackson, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 RESPONSE re #107 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #106 Notice of Filing,,, filed by TEC Holdings, Inc., TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Jackson, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION for Relief from #63 Order on Motion for Protective Order with Brief In Support by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 RESPONSE in Opposition re #99 MOTION for Reconsideration re #92 Order filed by TEC Holdings, Inc., TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Jackson, John) Text modified on 2/28/2019 (btql). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING #109 Motion for Extension of Time through and including 3/14/2019 for Defendants to file and serve their response to #105 MOTION to Amend #20 Amended Complaint . Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/25/2019. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint re: #105 MOTION to Amend #20 Amended Complaint, with Brief In Support by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Megan) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING #104 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact discovery ends on 5/31/2019. Parties shall complete their ESI production by 3/1/2019. There will be no further discovery extensions. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/19/2019. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #106 Notice of Filing with Brief In Support by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Sealed Exhibits to Motion for Leave to Amend by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC re #105 MOTION to Amend #20 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit J, #9 Exhibit K, #10 Exhibit L, #11 Exhibit M, #12 Exhibit N, #13 Exhibit O, #14 Exhibit P, #15 Exhibit Q, #16 Exhibit R, #17 Exhibit S, #18 Exhibit T, #19 Exhibit U, #20 Exhibit V, #21 Exhibit W, #22 Exhibit Y, #23 Exhibit Z, #24 Exhibit AA, #25 Exhibit BB, #26 Exhibit CC)(Cornwell, Dorothy) Modified on 5/14/2019 to seal docket entry per #128 Order (btql). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION to Amend #20 Amended Complaint, with Brief In Support by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery & Joint Report Regarding Status of Fact Discovery by TEC Holdings, Inc., TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting MEXT)(Jackson, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Responses by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc..(Kivus, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING #100 Motion for Extension of Time through and including 2/27/2019 for defendants to file and serve their response to the #99 MOTION for Reconsideration re #92 Order. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/12/2019. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 RESPONSE in Opposition re #100 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's January 4, 2019 Order re: #99 MOTION for Reconsideration re #92 Order on Motion to Strike,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Orde filed by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's January 4, 2019 Order re: #99 MOTION for Reconsideration re #92 Order with Brief In Support by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taylor, Scott) Text modified on 2/12/2019 (btql). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MOTION for Reconsideration re #92 Order with Brief In Support by Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Court's January 4, 2019 Order)(Cornwell, Dorothy) Text modified on 2/4/2019 (btql). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 2-11-2019, 2-12-2019, 3-18-2019, 3-19-2019, 4-1-2019, 4-2-2019, 4-3-2019, 4-4-2019, by Dorothy Cornwell. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #95 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ends on 2/28/2019. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/8/19. (jpa) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference Proceedings held on 1/7/2019, before Judge Leigh Martin May. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shannon R. Welch, RMR, CRR, Telephone number 404-215-1383. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (srw) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Entry of Amended Scheduling Order) by TEC Holdings, Inc., TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Amended Scheduling Order)(Jackson, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 AMENDED ORDER: This matter is before the Court following a teleconference with the parties. The Court's Order #92 entered on January 4, 2019 contains a typographical error. Accordingly, the Court clarifies that Defendants' Twenty Second Affirmative Defense is not struck and therefore remains a defense. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/7/2019. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leigh Martin May: Telephone Conference held on 1/7/2019 at the parties' request to discuss a discovery dispute. The Court heard from Plaintiffs' and Defendants' counsel. The parties were directed to confer on a new scheduling order and submit it to the Court by noon on Tuesday, January 8, 2019. The parties shall also confer on the deadlines for Plaintiffs to submit any new objections to ESI search terms, for Defendants to respond to see if they resolve the objections by narrowing the search terms and for both parties to search for and provide any remaining ESI. The Court tentatively has scheduled a telephone conference for Wednesday, January 16, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. The parties should submit an agenda by noon on Tuesday, January 15, 2019 if they are ready to proceed with the conference. (Court Reporter Shannon Welch)(btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Defendants' First Amended Counterclaims #66 . Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' First Amended Affirmative Defenses is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART #65 . The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion to strike Defendants' Defenses 1-4, 6, 7, 9, 18, 20-23, 26, and 27. Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Or in the Alternative to Stay #75 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Court GRANTS Defendants Motion as to Plaintiffs' claims under the DTSA and the Georgia Trade Secrets Act. The Court DENIES Defendants' Motion as to Plaintiffs claims for violations of the CFAA, the DMCA, copyright infringement, and for attorneys' fees. The Court also DENIES Defendants request to stay this proceeding for referral to the FDA. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/4/2019. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by TEC Holdings, Inc., TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. (Jackson, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #87 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Douglas B. McKnight. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/22/2018. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #87 APPLICATION for Admission of Douglas B. McKnight Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Douglas B. McKnight added appearing on behalf of Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC (pmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting the parties' #89 Joint Motion for Extension of Time, until and including January 28, 2019, to Complete Discovery. The Court notes she will be reluctant to grant future extensions. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/18/18. (ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC.(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 APPLICATION for Admission of Douglas B. McKnight Pro Hac Vice by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses To Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories filed by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. (Taylor, Scott) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Responses by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc..(Jackson, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Submission of #75 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Stay to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 REPLY BRIEF re #75 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, to Stay MOTION to Stay filed by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Taylor, Scott) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #81 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Gregory Vose. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 09/26/2018. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by TEC Holdings, Inc. Defendants' Certificate of Service of Discovery Responses (Mitchell, Megan) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #81 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory Vose Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8158756). Attorney Gregory Vose added appearing on behalf of Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC (pmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' request for a 14 day extension to respond to Plaintiffs' second set of interrogatories. Defendants shall have through and including October 8, 2018 to respond. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 09/24/2018. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory Vose Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8158756) with Brief In Support by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Submission of #66 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' First Amended Counterclaims, #65 MOTION to Strike Defendants' First Amended Affirmative Defenses, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (hfm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REPLY BRIEF re #66 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' First Amended Counterclaims filed by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 REPLY BRIEF re #65 MOTION to Strike Defendants' First Amended Affirmative Defenses filed by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition re #75 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, to Stay MOTION to Stay filed by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order RETURN of #77 APPLICATION for Admission of Douglas B. McKnight Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8129596) to attorney for correction. (pmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 APPLICATION for Admission of Douglas B. McKnight Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8129596) with Brief In Support by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service of Discovery by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC.(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Stay with Brief In Support by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A - Guidance for Industry)(Taylor, Scott) . Added MOTION to Stay on 9/4/2018 (hfm). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 RESPONSE re #65 MOTION to Strike Defendants' First Amended Affirmative Defenses filed by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Taylor, Scott) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 RESPONSE re #66 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' First Amended Counterclaims filed by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Taylor, Scott) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC.(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC.(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting in part #67 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ends on 10/29/2018. The parties shall contact the Court for a conference prior to the expiration of the new discovery period if, at that time, they believe additional time is needed, and the Court will schedule a call at that time. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 8/28/18. (hfm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 RESPONSE re #67 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Plaintiffs' Partial Consent to and Partial Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Extension of the Discovery Period filed by Philips Electronics India Ltd.. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RESPONSE re #67 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Plaintiff's Partial Consent To and Partial Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Extension of the Discovery Period filed by Philips Electronics India Ltd.. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taylor, Scott) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Submission of #66 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' First Amended Counterclaims, #65 MOTION to Strike Defendants' First Amended Affirmative Defenses, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (hfm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' First Amended Counterclaims with Brief In Support by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION to Strike Defendants' First Amended Affirmative Defenses with Brief In Support by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 E-DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 8/1/18. (hfm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 8/1/18. (hfm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and E-Discovery Order with Brief In Support by Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Protective Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order E-Discovery Order)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Requests by Transtate Equipment Company, Inc..(Kivus, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Philips Electronics India Ltd..(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying as moot #52 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot #53 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/3/18. (hfm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Submission of #53 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims, #52 MOTION to Strike #46 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, #45 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, , to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (hfm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. of Discovery Responses (Taylor, Scott) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 AMENDED ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC by Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Taylor, Scott)[Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AMENDED ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC by TEC Holdings, Inc.. (Taylor, Scott) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER - The parties have a dispute as to the proposed protective order as it relates to in-house counsel. The Court will allow one designated in-house counsel to review documents marked Attorney Eyes Only after that designated in-house counsel enters a formal appearance in this case. The Court will restrict the in-house counsel from receiving the Source Code. Entered by Judge Leigh Martin May on 06/29/2018. (LMM) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER - The parties have a dispute as to whether discovery relating to Defendants' Counterclaims and Affirmative Defenses should be stayed. The Court will not grant a stay. Given the potentially intertwined nature of the allegations, the Court is concerned that partially staying discovery would likely generate more confusion as to the scope of discovery and result in a less efficient discovery process. The Court will agree to expedite its order on the pending motion so that the parties will have the Court's guidance on these claims as soon as possible. Entered by Judge Leigh Martin May on 06/29/2018. (LMM) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING #54 Motion for Extension of Time through and including 7/2/2018 for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' #52 MOTION to Strike #46 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, #45 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, #53 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims. The deadline for Defendants to serve any amended Answer, Defenses, and Counterclaims is extended through and including 7/2/2018. See Order for related briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 6/1/2018. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond re: #52 MOTION to Strike #46 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, #45 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, , #53 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taylor, Scott) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #51 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher Robert Brennan. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 05/24/2018. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #51 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher Robert Brennan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7871832). Attorney Christopher Robert Brennan added appearing on behalf of Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC (pmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims with Brief In Support by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Brief Brief in Support)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION to Strike #46 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, #45 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, with Brief In Support by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 APPLICATION for Admission of Christopher Robert Brennan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7871832)by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: TEC Holdings, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiff by TEC Holdings, Inc..(Mitchell, Megan) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC.(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING #47 Motion for Extension of Time through and including 5/18/2018 for Plaintiffs to answer Defendants #45 , #46 Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/9/2018. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Defendants' Counterclaims re: #46 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, #45 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #43 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to John Christopher Jackson; granting #44 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to John Timothy Kivus. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 03/29/2018. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Defendant TEC Holdings, Inc.'s ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand by TEC Holdings, Inc..(Taylor, Scott) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Defendant Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.'s ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses and ( Discovery ends on 8/27/2018.), COUNTERCLAIM to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand by Transtate Equipment Company, Inc..(Taylor, Scott) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #43 APPLICATION for Admission of John Christopher Jackson Pro Hac Vice (per rb) (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7767825). Attorney John Christopher Jackson added appearing on behalf of TEC Holdings, Inc., TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. (pmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #44 APPLICATION for Admission of John Timothy Kivus Pro Hac Vice (per rb) (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7767843). Attorney John Timothy Kivus added appearing on behalf of TEC Holdings, Inc., TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. (pmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 APPLICATION for Admission of John Timothy Kivus Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7767843) with Brief In Support by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taylor, Scott) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 APPLICATION for Admission of John Christopher Jackson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7767825) with Brief In Support by TEC Holdings, Inc., Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taylor, Scott) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Defendants TEC Holdings and Defendant Transtate's #27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and #34 Motion to Dismiss. See Order for specifics. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/14/2018. (btql) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Submission of #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM,submitted to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (hfm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPLY BRIEF re #34 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Taylor, Scott) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REPLY BRIEF re #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #20 First Amended Complaint filed by TEC Holdings, Inc.. (Taylor, Scott) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Submission of #34 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, submitted to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (hfm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying #14 Motion to Transfer Case, denying as moot #32 Motion to Disregard #31 Reply Declaration of Daniel R. Wheeler. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/2/18. (hfm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Submission of #32 MOTION Disregard #31 Reply Declaration of Daniel R. Wheeler, submitted to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (hfm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION Disregard #31 Reply Declaration of Daniel R. Wheeler filed by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #20 First Amended Complaint filed by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RESPONSE re #32 MOTION Disregard #31 Reply Declaration of Daniel R. Wheeler filed by TEC Holdings, Inc.. (Taylor, Scott) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support)(Taylor, Scott) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Scott Ernest Taylor replacing attorney Michael Awni Boutros and Halsey G. Knapp, Jr. (Taylor, Scott) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION Disregard #31 Reply Declaration of Daniel R. Wheeler, with Brief In Support by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Disregard the Reply Declaration of Daniel R. Wheeler)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Submission of #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to The U.S. District for the Western District of North Carolina, submitted to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (hfm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER denying as moot #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim because Plaintiffs filed an amended complaint. Entered by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/17/17. (LMM) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY BRIEF re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to The U.S. District for the Western District of North Carolina filed by TEC Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Declaration of Daniel R. Wheeler, #2 Exhibit B - Order)(Taylor, Scott) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time, through and including December 5, 2017, for defendant Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. to answer, file a motion, or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint. The deadline for Plaintiffs to respond to any motion to dismiss filed by Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. will be December 19, 2017. The deadline for Plaintiffs to respond re #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM is extended to December 19, 2017. The deadline for both defendants to file replies in support of their motions to dismiss will be extended to January 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 11/16/17. (hfm) Modified on 11/17/2017 to correct reply brief date (rvb). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Answer, File a Motion, Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Halsey G. Knapp, Jr on behalf of Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. (Knapp, Halsey) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #20 First Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by TEC Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 - 01/13/17 Letter, #3 Exhibit 2 - 05/02/17 Subcommittee Meeting Transcript)(Taylor, Scott) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to The U.S. District for the Western District of North Carolina filed by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Dorothy Cornwell, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Douglas B. McKnight)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER re #23 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The Court orders that the time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court, except as herein modified: The parties should contact the Court with the specific amount of time requested for discovery if it is in excess of the four months typically allowed. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/31/17. (hfm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Return of Service Executed by Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips North America LLC. Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. served on 10/26/2017, answer due 11/16/2017. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #18 APPLICATION for Admission of Kirsten R. Rydstrom Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7445551). Attorney Kirsten R. Rydstrom added appearing on behalf of Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC (pmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Kirsten R. Rydstrom. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/23/2017. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Electronic Summons Issued as to Transtate Equipment Company, Inc. (hfm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 First AMENDED COMPLAINT (corrected to add Certificate of Service) against All Defendants with Jury Demand, filed by Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Registration, #2 Summons)(Cornwell, Dorothy) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Kirsten R. Rydstrom Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7445551)by Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V.. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting the #16 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer. The deadline for plaintiffs to respond to defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #13 and Motion to Transfer #14 is extended for a period of 20 days, through and including November 2, 2017. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/10/17. (ddm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer re: #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to The U.S. District for the Western District of North Carolina by Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Clerks Notation re #15 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Persons by TEC Holdings, Inc.. (Mitchell, Megan) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer Case to The U.S. District for the Western District of North Carolina with Brief In Support by TEC Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Daniel R. Wheeler)(Taylor, Scott) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by TEC Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 - 01/13/17 Letter, #3 Exhibit 2 - Joe Robinson testimony)(Taylor, Scott) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Gerard M. Donovan. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 08/21/2017. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Gerard M. Donovan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7301802). Attorney Gerard M. Donovan added appearing on behalf of Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC (pmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. TEC Holdings, Inc.'s Answer is due 9/29/2017. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 08/18/2017. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by TEC Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taylor, Scott) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan P. Mitchell on behalf of TEC Holdings, Inc. (Mitchell, Megan) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry R. Chalmers on behalf of TEC Holdings, Inc. (Chalmers, Henry) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Ernest Taylor on behalf of TEC Holdings, Inc. (Taylor, Scott) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips North America LLC. TEC Holdings, Inc. served on 8/9/2017, answer due 8/30/2017. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Gerard M. Donovan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7301802)by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 8/1/17. (hfm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC identifying Corporate Parent Koninklijke Philips N.V for Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips North America LLC. (Cornwell, Dorothy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AO Form 121 mailed to Register of Copyrights. (jkl) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to TEC Holdings, Inc. (jkl) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V., Philips Electronics India Ltd., Philips North America LLC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-7294162.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of registration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jkl) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 1/10/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V. et al v. TEC Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEC Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Megan P. Mitchell
Represented By: John Christopher Jackson
Represented By: Henry R. Chalmers
Represented By: Scott Ernest Taylor
Represented By: John Timothy Kivus
Represented By: John T. Kivus
Represented By: J. Christopher Jackson
Represented By: Harrison Mann Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transtate Equipment Company, Inc.
Represented By: John Christopher Jackson
Represented By: Megan P. Mitchell
Represented By: Henry R. Chalmers
Represented By: Scott Ernest Taylor
Represented By: John Timothy Kivus
Represented By: John T. Kivus
Represented By: J. Christopher Jackson
Represented By: Harrison Mann Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. [Andy] Wheeler
Represented By: Lora A. Brzezynski
Represented By: John C. Amabile
Represented By: Thatcher A. Rahmeier
Represented By: David W. Higer
Represented By: Charles E. Raynal, IV
Represented By: Nicholas Hayes Lee
Represented By: Stephen Vincent Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips Medical Systems Nederland B.V.
Represented By: Douglas B. McKnight
Represented By: Richard A. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Christopher Robert Brennan
Represented By: Gregory Vose
Represented By: Kirsten R. Rydstrom
Represented By: Gerard M. Donovan
Represented By: Dorothy Cornwell
Represented By: Doug B. McKnight
Represented By: Gregory D. Vose
Represented By: Jeffrey Phillips MacHarg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips India Ltd.
Represented By: Douglas B. McKnight
Represented By: Richard A. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Christopher Robert Brennan
Represented By: Gregory Vose
Represented By: Kirsten R. Rydstrom
Represented By: Gerard M. Donovan
Represented By: Dorothy Cornwell
Represented By: Doug B. McKnight
Represented By: Gregory D. Vose
Represented By: Jeffrey Phillips MacHarg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philips North America LLC
Represented By: Douglas B. McKnight
Represented By: Richard A. Graham, Jr
Represented By: Christopher Robert Brennan
Represented By: Gregory Vose
Represented By: Kirsten R. Rydstrom
Represented By: Gerard M. Donovan
Represented By: Dorothy Cornwell
Represented By: Doug B. McKnight
Represented By: Gregory D. Vose
Represented By: Jeffrey Phillips MacHarg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dale Dorow
Represented By: Charles E. Raynal, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Griswold
Represented By: Charles E. Raynal, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?