Ballantyne Village Parking, LLC v. ASVRF SP Ballantyne Village JV, LLC
Plaintiff: Ballantyne Village Parking, LLC
Defendant: ASVRF SP Ballantyne Village JV, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00040
Filed: January 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Max O Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying Defendant's #4 Motion to Dismiss. The Court will hold this matter in abeyance until resolution of the ongoing action in state court. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 3/9/2020. (brl)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss by ASVRF SP Ballantyne Village JV, LLC. (Tyler, Scott)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Ballantyne Village Parking, LLC. Replies due by 3/5/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Whitaker, Gregory)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Donald Whitaker on behalf of Ballantyne Village Parking, LLC (Whitaker, Gregory) Modified text on 2/20/2020 (ctb).
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by ASVRF SP Ballantyne Village JV, LLC. Responses due by 2/27/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award with Supporting Exhibits A-D, #3 Exhibit 2 - State Court Supplement to Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award with Supporting Exhibits E-F, #4 Exhibit 3 - State Court Amendment to Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award)(Tyler, Scott)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ballantyne Village Parking, LLC. ASVRF SP Ballantyne Village JV, LLC served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (Terpening, William)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to ASVRF SP Ballantyne Village JV, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brj) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/21/2020) (brj).
January 20, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
January 20, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Confirm Arbitration Award (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4349163), filed by Ballantyne Village Parking, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amendment, #2 Exhibit B - Demand for Arbitration, #3 Exhibit C - Initial Award, #4 Exhibit D - Motion to Modify, #5 Exhibit E - Order, #6 Exhibit F - Final Award, #7 Exhibit G - Proposed Order)(Terpening, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ballantyne Village Parking, LLC v. ASVRF SP Ballantyne Village JV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASVRF SP Ballantyne Village JV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ballantyne Village Parking, LLC
Represented By: William R. Terpening
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?