The Cato Corporation v. Consultative Sales Professionals, LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Cato Corporation
Defendant: Freightmaster USA, LLC, Consultative Sales Professionals, LLC and Carolina National Transportation, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00052
Filed: January 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Max O Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 11 Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Freightmaster USA, LLC.(Bostic, Ryan)
February 28, 2020 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Consultative Sales Professionals, LLC. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns (ctb)
February 27, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Default by The Cato Corporation. (Lathrop, Anthony)
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by The Cato Corporation. Carolina National Transportation, LLC served on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Registered Agent, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service on President, #3 Exhibit C - Proof of Service on Vice President)(Lathrop, Anthony)
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by The Cato Corporation. Consultative Sales Professionals, LLC served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - UPS Proof of Service)(Lathrop, Anthony)
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by The Cato Corporation. Freightmaster USA, LLC served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - UPS Proof of Service)(Lathrop, Anthony)
January 31, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Reissued Electronically as to Carolina National Transportation, LLC, Consultative Sales Professionals, LLC, Freightmaster USA, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (tmg)
January 28, 2020 Filing 4 Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Cato Corporation (Lathrop, Anthony)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Cato Corporation (Lathrop, Anthony)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(brj)
January 26, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj)
January 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4358180), filed by The Cato Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lathrop, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Cato Corporation v. Consultative Sales Professionals, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cato Corporation
Represented By: Anthony T. Lathrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freightmaster USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consultative Sales Professionals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolina National Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?