B-21 Wines, Inc. et al v. Guy et al
Plaintiff: Mike Rash, Bob Kunkle, Lila Rash, Justin Hammer and B-21 Wines, Inc.
Defendant: Joshua Stein and A.D. Guy, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00099
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Defendants' Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including April 27, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/6/20. (mga)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by A.D. Guy, Jr, Joshua Stein. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Welty, Jeffrey). Motions referred to David Keesler.
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants A.D. Guy, Jr and Joshua Stein shall have up to and including April 7, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/10/20. (mga)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by A.D. Guy, Jr, Joshua Stein. (Welty, Jeffrey). Motions referred to David Keesler.
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey B. Welty on behalf of All Defendants (Welty, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by B-21 Wines, Inc. (Trosch, William)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by B-21 Wines, Inc., Justin Hammer, Mike Rash, Lila Rash, Bob Kunkle. Joshua Stein served on 2/25/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. (Trosch, William)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by B-21 Wines, Inc., Justin Hammer, Mike Rash, Lila Rash, Bob Kunkle. A.D. Guy, Jr served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (Trosch, William)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. James A. Tanford is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs, B-21 Wines, Inc., Justin Hammer, Bob Kunkle, Lila Rash, and Mike Rash. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/4/20. (mga)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice to James A. Tanford: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 3/11/2020. (mga)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James A. Tanford Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4410842. by B-21 Wines, Inc., Justin Hammer, Bob Kunkle, Lila Rash, Mike Rash. (Trosch, William). Motions referred to David Keesler.
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. James E. Porter, II for B-21 Wines, Inc., Justin Hammer, Bob Kunkle, Lila Rash, and Mike Rash. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/3/20. (mga)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Robert D. Epstein is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent B-21 Wines, Inc., Justin Hammer, Bob Kunkle, Lila Rash,and Mike Rash. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/3/20. (mga)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice to James E. Porter II: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 3/10/2020. (mga)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James E. Porter, II Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4408906. by B-21 Wines, Inc., Justin Hammer, Bob Kunkle, Lila Rash, Mike Rash. (Trosch, William). Motions referred to David Keesler.
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert D. Epstein Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4408904. by B-21 Wines, Inc., Justin Hammer, Bob Kunkle, Lila Rash, Mike Rash. (Trosch, William). Motions referred to David Keesler.
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to A.D. Guy, Jr, Joshua Stein. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ctb)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ctb)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (ctb)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A.D. Guy, Jr, Joshua Stein ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CHD058421), filed by B-21 Wines, Inc., Justin Hammer, Mike Rash, Lila Rash, Bob Kunkle.(ctb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B-21 Wines, Inc. et al v. Guy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Rash
Represented By: William Conrad Trosch
Represented By: Robert D. Epstein
Represented By: James E. Porter, II
Represented By: James Alexander Tanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob Kunkle
Represented By: William Conrad Trosch
Represented By: Robert D. Epstein
Represented By: James E. Porter, II
Represented By: James Alexander Tanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lila Rash
Represented By: William Conrad Trosch
Represented By: Robert D. Epstein
Represented By: James E. Porter, II
Represented By: James Alexander Tanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Hammer
Represented By: William Conrad Trosch
Represented By: Robert D. Epstein
Represented By: James E. Porter, II
Represented By: James Alexander Tanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B-21 Wines, Inc.
Represented By: William Conrad Trosch
Represented By: Robert D. Epstein
Represented By: James E. Porter, II
Represented By: James Alexander Tanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Stein
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Welty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.D. Guy, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Welty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?